This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:18:13 (UTC).

Young et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Young filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Lungstrum and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02411

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Lungstrum

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sharon Young

Paul Young

Defendants

Linn Star Holdings

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle W. Burns

Attorney at Property Law Firm

4630 W. 137Th Street, Suite 100

Leawood, KS 66224

Defendant Attorney

Hal D. Meltzer

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - OP

51 Corporate Woods, 9393 W. 110Th Street, Suite 500

Overland Park, KS 66210

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Exhibit B

11 #2

Exhibit A

11 #1

Exhibit Index

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Linn Star Holdings re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

10 #2

Exhibit A

10 #1

Exhibit List

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Young, Sharon Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Young, Sharon Young (Burns, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/4/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/27/18. (ss) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as corporate parent . (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Linn Star Holdings. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc.. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 18CV03733 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4554749.), filed by Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • (#12) ORDER CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: in light of the pending motion to remand to state court (ECF No. 9) and by agreement of the parties, the scheduling conference set for October 11, 2018, is cancelled. The parties are relieved at this time of their obligations to submit initial disclosures and a planning-meeting report. Within five business days of a ruling on plaintiffs' pending motion to remand to state court, the parties are ordered to submit their initial disclosures and planning-meeting report to the undersigned's chambers, unless the case is remanded. Upon receipt, the court will reset the scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/4/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Linn Star Holdings re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Young, Sharon Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Young, Sharon Young (Burns, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/4/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/27/18. (ss) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as corporate parent . (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Linn Star Holdings. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc.. (Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 18CV03733 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4554749.), filed by Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meltzer, Hal) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less