This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2018 at 06:41:22 (UTC).

Yolo Capital, Inc. v. Normand et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 Yolo Capital, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Normand. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yolo Capital, Inc.

Defendants

Truck Capital, LLC.

Coast Management Systems, LLC

Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd.

Louis J. Normand, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Upson Kanipe

Attorney at McGuire, Wood & Bissette, P.A.

48 Patton Ave.

Asheville, NC 28801

Joseph Pinckney McGuire

Attorney at McGuire, Wood & Bissette, P. A.

P. O. Box 3180

Asheville, NC 28802-3180

Defendant Attorneys

Jason R. Watkins

Attorney at O'HARA WATKINS, LLC

1307 Main Street

Daphne, AL 36526

Joseph Kellam Warren

Attorney at Mainsail Lawyers

14 South Pack Square, Suite 502

Asheville, NC 28801

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Letter sent to Joseph Kellam Warren, Joseph Pinckney McGuire, and Peter Upson Kanipe on 2/23/18 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Watkins on behalf of Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC. (Watkins, Jason) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

22 #1

*Restricted*

#22

(#22) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 1:17-cv-00180. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/23/2018)

#21

(#21) RESPONSE re #20 Order on Motion to Change Venue,, Order on Motion to Stay, by Yolo Capital, Inc.. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting Defts' #9 Motion to Transfer Venue, and this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi; denying as moot Defts' #11 Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/26/2018. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Upson Kanipe on behalf of Yolo Capital, Inc. (Kanipe, Peter) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 10/11/2017)

#11

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline To File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading by Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Debtors' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Warren, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

#9

(#20) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting Defts' #9 Motion to Transfer Venue, and this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi; denying as moot Defts' #11 Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/26/2018. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)

2 #4

Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd.

2 #3

Trustee Louis J. Normand, Jr.

2 #2

Coast Management Systems, LLC

2 #1

Truck Capital, LLC

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Truck Capital, LLC, #2 Coast Management Systems, LLC, #3 Trustee Louis J. Normand, Jr., #4 Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd.)(emw) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/12/2017)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Louis J. Normand, Jr.; Truck Capital, LLC; Coast Management Systems, LLC and Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd. answer due 8/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/28/17. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Letter sent to Joseph Kellam Warren, Joseph Pinckney McGuire, and Peter Upson Kanipe on 2/23/18 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Watkins on behalf of Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC. (Watkins, Jason) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 1:17-cv-00180. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Case electronically transferred to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE re #20 Order on Motion to Change Venue,, Order on Motion to Stay, by Yolo Capital, Inc.. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting Defts' #9 Motion to Transfer Venue, and this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi; denying as moot Defts' #11 Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/26/2018. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Upson Kanipe on behalf of Yolo Capital, Inc. (Kanipe, Peter) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 10/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by Yolo Capital, Inc. of Filing Bankruptcy Court Order (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE by Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC re #16 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Errata and Correction to Exhibit A to Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Stay Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline To File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction With Exhibit Affidavits)(Warren, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline To File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading by Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Debtors' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Warren, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Change Venue by Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Warren, Joseph). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Louis J. Normand, Jr.; Truck Capital, LLC; Coast Management Systems, LLC and Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd. answer due 8/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/28/17. (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Coast Management Systems, LLC, Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Louis J. Normand, Jr, Truck Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Warren, Joseph). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Yolo Capital, Inc.. Coast Management Systems, LLC served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Yolo Capital, Inc.. Truck Capital, LLC served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Yolo Capital, Inc.. Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd. served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017; Louis J. Normand, Jr served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yolo Capital, Inc. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Truck Capital, LLC, #2 Coast Management Systems, LLC, #3 Trustee Louis J. Normand, Jr., #4 Global Transportation Reinsurance Co., Ltd.)(emw) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(emw) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3390061), filed by Yolo Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yolo Capital, Inc. is a litigant