This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 07:31:17 (UTC).

Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County v. Allegiance Health Management Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allegiance Health Management Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00906

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County

Defendants

Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC

Allegiance Health Management Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Devin R. Bates

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

John Keeling Baker

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

J. David Crisp

Attorney at Crisp & Freeze

1825 Moores Lane

Texarkana, TX 75503

Robert David Freeze

Attorney at Crisp & Freeze

1825 Moores Lane

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes David Crisp and Robert Freeze to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse in Little Rock on 1/9/2019 for a hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/2019. (jak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#10

(#10) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC.(Freeze, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Adjudication and to Shorten Response Time by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER partly granting as modified and mostly denying without prejudice #6 motion. Defendants' answers or Rule 12(b) motions are due, by the Court's count, on 12/28/2018. The Court directs counsel for all parties to confer by telephone within 7 calendar days thereafter on the scheduling issues discussed in No #6 . The Court will hold an in-person Rule 16 conference at 9:30 a.m. on 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. Allegiance Health Management Inc served on 12/7/2018. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC served on 12/7/2018. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANTS (Freeze, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Adjudication and to Shorten Response Time by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/7/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#15

(#15) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/31/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 7/10/2019. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/9/2019. (slb) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069911. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Freeze on behalf of Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC (Freeze, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#7

(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Expedite Discovery and Adjudication and to Shorten Response Time filed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Crisp on behalf of Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC (Crisp, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANTS (Freeze, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/31/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 7/10/2019. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/9/2019. (slb) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • (#14) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for scheduling conference on 9 January 2019 before Judge D. P. Marshall, Jr.: After hearing from counsel for the parties, the Court set initial deadlines. A Final Scheduling Order will follow. (For Plaintiff: J. Baker and D. Bates; For Defendants: D. Crisp and R. Freeze; and Court Reporter Margie Kruse). (slb) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes David Crisp and Robert Freeze to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse in Little Rock on 1/9/2019 for a hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/2019. (jak) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Crisp on behalf of Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC (Crisp, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Freeze on behalf of Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC (Freeze, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allegiance Health Management Inc, Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC.(Freeze, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER partly granting as modified and mostly denying without prejudice #6 motion. Defendants' answers or Rule 12(b) motions are due, by the Court's count, on 12/28/2018. The Court directs counsel for all parties to confer by telephone within 7 calendar days thereafter on the scheduling issues discussed in No #6 . The Court will hold an in-person Rule 16 conference at 9:30 a.m. on 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Adjudication and to Shorten Response Time by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Expedite Discovery and Adjudication and to Shorten Response Time filed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Adjudication and to Shorten Response Time by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. Dardanelle Community Hospital LLC served on 12/7/2018. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County. Allegiance Health Management Inc served on 12/7/2018. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (kbc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/7/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Yell County Board of Governors of Dardanelle Hospital of Yell County against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069911. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.