This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:12:31 (UTC).

Yarte v. CHHJ Seattle, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Yarte filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHHJ Seattle, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01033

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Yarte

Defendants

Magnus Olason

Karin Olason

CHHJ Seattle

CHHJ Seattle, LLC

Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spencer Nathan Thal

Attorney at VANGUARD LAW

Po Box 939

Poulsbo, WA 98370

Defendant Attorneys

Marianne K Jones

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

11819 Ne 34Th St

Bellevue, WA 98005

Jordan E Jones

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

11819 Ne 34Th St

Bellevue, WA 98005

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Magnus Olason mailed on 8/14/2018 (Jones, Marianne) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan E Jones on behalf of Defendants Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason, CHHJ Seattle, LLC, Magnus Olason. (Jones, Jordan) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marianne K Jones on behalf of Defendants Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason, CHHJ Seattle, LLC, Magnus Olason. (Jones, Marianne) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Karin Olason on 7/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Yarte. (Thal, Spencer) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CHHJ Seattle, LLC on 7/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Yarte. (Thal, Spencer) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason, CHHJ Seattle LLC, Magnus Olason. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DJ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5396081) Attorney Spencer Nathan Thal added to party Ryan Yarte(pty:pla), filed by Ryan Yarte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Thal, Spencer) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Magnus Olason mailed on 8/14/2018 (Jones, Marianne) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan E Jones on behalf of Defendants Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason, CHHJ Seattle, LLC, Magnus Olason. (Jones, Jordan) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #5 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Jordan E. Jones. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marianne K Jones on behalf of Defendants Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason, CHHJ Seattle, LLC, Magnus Olason. (Jones, Marianne) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Karin Olason on 7/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Yarte. (Thal, Spencer) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CHHJ Seattle, LLC on 7/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Yarte. (Thal, Spencer) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Karin Elisabeth Bornschein Olason, CHHJ Seattle LLC, Magnus Olason. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DJ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5396081) Attorney Spencer Nathan Thal added to party Ryan Yarte(pty:pla), filed by Ryan Yarte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Thal, Spencer) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less