This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2018 at 05:52:20 (UTC).

Yaa v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Yaa filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00141

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Mwakamsha Yaa

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Thomas Dassow

Attorney at Hovde Dassow & Deets LLC

10201 N. Illinois, Suite 500

Indianapolis, IN 46290

 

Court Documents

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 1:17-cv-04745. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#10

(#10) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Kentucky, IN RE: MDL 2809 on February 20, 2018. (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#9

(#9) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. IN RE: ONGLYZA (SAXAGLIPTIN) AND KOMBIGLYZE XR (SAXAGLIPTIN AND METFORMIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2809 per Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3). (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Dassow, Robert) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#7

(#7) MARGINAL ENTRY - re #6 MOTION Supplemental Jurisdiction Statement filed by SAMUEL MWAKAMSHA YAA. The Court does not add language to the complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint which contains his supplemental jurisdiction statement. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/17/2018. (MEJ) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#6

(#6) Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement, filed by Plaintiff SAMUEL MWAKAMSHA YAA. (Dassow, Robert) Modified on 1/16/2018 to correctly identify event (MEJ). [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/15/2018)

#5

(#5) ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - The Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify each of the partners of Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and their citizenship. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. See entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/2/2018. (MEJ) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/02/2018)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NAD) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (NAD) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Dassow on behalf of Plaintiff SAMUEL MWAKAMSHA YAA. (Dassow, Robert) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

1 #4

Proposed Summons Astrazeneca

1 #3

Proposed Summons McKesson

1 #2

Proposed Summons Summons Bristol

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4687575) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons Bristol, #3 Proposed Summons McKesson, #4 Proposed Summons Astrazeneca)(Dassow, Robert) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 1:17-cv-04745. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Kentucky, IN RE: MDL 2809 on February 20, 2018. (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. IN RE: ONGLYZA (SAXAGLIPTIN) AND KOMBIGLYZE XR (SAXAGLIPTIN AND METFORMIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2809 per Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3). (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Dassow, Robert) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MARGINAL ENTRY - re #6 MOTION Supplemental Jurisdiction Statement filed by SAMUEL MWAKAMSHA YAA. The Court does not add language to the complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint which contains his supplemental jurisdiction statement. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/17/2018. (MEJ) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement, filed by Plaintiff SAMUEL MWAKAMSHA YAA. (Dassow, Robert) Modified on 1/16/2018 to correctly identify event (MEJ). [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - The Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify each of the partners of Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and their citizenship. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. See entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/2/2018. (MEJ) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NAD) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MEYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (NAD) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Dassow on behalf of Plaintiff SAMUEL MWAKAMSHA YAA. (Dassow, Robert) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4687575) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons Bristol, #3 Proposed Summons McKesson, #4 Proposed Summons Astrazeneca)(Dassow, Robert) [Transferred from insd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less