This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 07:56:13 (UTC).

Xiong v. Beth

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Xiong filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Beth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01180

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Thao Xiong

Kenosha, WI 53144

Respondents

Jefferson Session

Kristjen Nelson

Ricardo Wong

Doug Simpson

David G Beth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Lisa T Warwick

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (ED-WI)

517 E Wisconsin Ave - Rm 530

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/10/2018. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Xiong's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than September 21, 2018, the respondent shall show cause why the petition for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the petition and this order upon the respondent, David G. Beth. (cc: all counsel, petitioner, David G. Beth, U.S. Attorney Matthew Krueger, U.S. Dept of Homeland Security, U.S. Dept of Justice and ICE via USPS ) (mlm)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Page 14 of Petition

#5

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC § 2241 filed by Thao Xiong. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $5)(lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2018: #1 Page 14 of Petition) (lz).

#4

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUPPLEMENT by David G Beth to Respondent's Return and Memorandum in Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Warwick, Lisa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE filed by David G Beth, Kristjen Nelson, Jefferson Session, Doug Simpson, Ricardo Wong re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus RESPONDENTS RETURN AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Warwick, Lisa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thao Xiong. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER from Petitioner enclosing Prisoner Trust Account Statement and $5 Filing Fee. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David G Beth. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of David G Beth. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/10/2018. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Xiong's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than September 21, 2018, the respondent shall show cause why the petition for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the petition and this order upon the respondent, David G. Beth. (cc: all counsel, petitioner, David G. Beth, U.S. Attorney Matthew Krueger, U.S. Dept of Homeland Security, U.S. Dept of Justice and ICE via USPS ) (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Thao Xiong. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Thao Xiong. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days; and to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit the enclosed petition to proceed without prepayment of the fees and submit a 6-month prisoner trust account statement within 21 days. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMMISSARY Statement by Thao Xiong. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INCOMPLETE REQUEST by Thao Xiong to proceed without prepayment of fees and/or costs (missing pages 2 and 3). (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC § 2241 filed by Thao Xiong. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $5)(lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2018: #1 Page 14 of Petition) (lz).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.