This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2017 at 02:09:04 (UTC).

Xiong v. McCormick et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 Xiong filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against McCormick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joe J. Volpe and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joe J. Volpe

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pao Xiong

Forrest City, AR 72336-9000

Defendants

Keri Avant

William McCormick

 

Court Documents

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case electronically transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:17-cv-00872. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/13/2017)

#9

(#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #5 Report and Recommendation, this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/13/17. (jw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE (other) by Pao Xiong requesting that all mail be marked as legal mail in accordance with the BOP regulations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend (1 in 5:17-cv-00872-R) Complaint, (1 in 5:17-cv-00873-R) Complaint, (1 in 5:17-cv-00875-R) Complaint by Pao Xiong. Motions referred. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petitioner/Plaintiff Pao Xiong, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Court TRANSFERthe Petition ECF No. #1 for lack of jurisdiction to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. In light of this recommendation, Petitioner's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #4 should be left for consideration by the transferee Court. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in thismatter. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/22/17. (mc) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/22/2017)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Attachment 1 Account Balances

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pao Xiong. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Account Balances, #2 Envelope)(kr) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Unsworn Declaration

1 #2

Signed Declaration

1 #1

Incident Report 274-8929, DOI 8/12/15

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Keri Avant, FNU Lepird, William McCormick filed by Pao Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Incident Report 274-8929, DOI 8/12/15, #2 Signed Declaration, #3 Unsworn Declaration, #4 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/15/2017)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case electronically transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:17-cv-00872. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #5 Report and Recommendation, this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/13/17. (jw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE (other) by Pao Xiong requesting that all mail be marked as legal mail in accordance with the BOP regulations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend (1 in 5:17-cv-00872-R) Complaint, (1 in 5:17-cv-00873-R) Complaint, (1 in 5:17-cv-00875-R) Complaint by Pao Xiong. Motions referred. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petitioner/Plaintiff Pao Xiong, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Court TRANSFERthe Petition ECF No. #1 for lack of jurisdiction to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. In light of this recommendation, Petitioner's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #4 should be left for consideration by the transferee Court. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in thismatter. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/22/17. (mc) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pao Xiong. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Account Balances, #2 Envelope)(kr) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mailing #1 , #3 , and LCvR5.4/Change of Address form to Pao Xiong #08898-089 FORREST CITY-LOW P O Box 9000 Forrest City, AR 72336 (kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin.. Entered by direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 8/16/17. (kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PREVIOUS Cases (reflects other cases filed the same date) (kw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/15/2017) (kw). [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Keri Avant, FNU Lepird, William McCormick filed by Pao Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Incident Report 274-8929, DOI 8/12/15, #2 Signed Declaration, #3 Unsworn Declaration, #4 Envelope)(kw) [Transferred from okwd on 9/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less