This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:45:27 (UTC).

Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Richard Caputo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02270

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Richard Caputo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police

Defendant

Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael R. Mey

Attorney at Wormuth, Mey & Sulla, LLP

318 Penn Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Scranton, PA 18503

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Blumenthal

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP

1760 Market St., Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4104

Michael T. McDonnell, III

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP

1760 Market Street, Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police.(Mey, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before January 4, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an opposition brief, the Court may grant the motion without a merits analysis.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/20/18. (dw) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

2 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(McDonnell, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group from Luzerne County, case number 2018-cv-2707. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4608200), filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(lh) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wyoming Valley Fraternal Order of Police.(Mey, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before January 4, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an opposition brief, the Court may grant the motion without a merits analysis.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/20/18. (dw) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(McDonnell, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group from Luzerne County, case number 2018-cv-2707. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4608200), filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast and Stock Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(lh) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.