This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2018 at 07:59:19 (UTC).

Wynn v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Wynn filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bridget S Bade and James A Teilborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02805

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Bridget S Bade

James A Teilborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theodore Wynn

Defendants

Equifax Information Services LLC

Trans Union LLC

National Association

Wells Fargo Bank

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Wayne Hippensteel

Attorney at McCarthy Law PLC

4250 N Drinkwater Blvd., Ste. 320

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Kevin Fallon McCarthy

Attorney at McCarthy Law PLC

4250 N Drinkwater Blvd., Ste. 320

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Defendant Attorneys

Adiba Jurayeva

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

John Neil Stuart

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daniel P Quigley

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Joshua Robert Zimmerman

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Gregory James Marshall

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

 

Court Documents

#34

#32

#31

#27

#26

#25

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

#20

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet -Supplemental

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Dispositive motions due by 6/21/2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/1/18. (MAW) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • (#33) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge James A Teilborg: Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2018. Deadlines discussed and entered. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Jacob Hippensteel for Plaintiff. Adiba Jurayeva and John Stuart for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 2:37 PM to 3:11 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Theodore Wynn. (Hippensteel, Jacob) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Settlement as to Transunion, LLC by Theodore Wynn. (Hippensteel, Jacob) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER: On October 3, 2018, (Doc. #20 ) this Court issued an Order setting a Rule 16 conference for October 31, 2018 (at 2:30 p.m.) and requiring a proposed case management plan be filed by October 19, 2018. The parties failed to timely file the case management plan. In the event the amended minute order at Doc. 22 created confusion, IT IS ORDERED confirming this Court's order at Doc. #20 including the October 31, 2018 Rule 16 conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a case management plan no later than October 26, 2018. Ordered by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/24/18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • (#29) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Theodore Wynn. (Hippensteel, Jacob) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Stuart, John) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Stipulation of Dismissal - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing without prejudice Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., only with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., only as a party in this action and remove its attorneys of record from receiving ECF Notifications. (Because other Defendants remain in this case, the case shall remain open.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/9/18. (LAD) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zimmerman, Joshua) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wells Fargo Bank NA. (ESL) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Notice of Removal by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jurayeva, Adiba) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Stuart, John) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - Scheduling (Case Management) Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 9/13/18. (LAD) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Zimmerman, Joshua) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15929219. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02805-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (BAC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Notice of Service re: Civil Summons, Complaint upon Trans Union LLC on 8/7/18 (original filed in McDowell Mountain Justice Court) upon Trans Union LLC.(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. (Stuart, John) (BAC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) *NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County, case number McDowell Mountain Justice Court. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-15929219 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Stuart, John) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet -Supplemental)(BAC) *Modified to correct filer on 9/7/2018 (BAC). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Fallon McCarthy