This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2018 at 07:27:12 (UTC).

Wright v. Rocky Top Xpress, LLC et al (TV3)

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 Wright filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rocky Top Xpress, LLC TV3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are H Bruce Guyton and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Wade

Alishia Wright

Petitioner

GEICO Advantage Insurance Company

Defendants

Lamonte Hardwick

Rocky Top Xpress, LLC

Daniel Roop

Jabez Expediting & Logistics, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Sam Aguiar

Attorney at Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC

1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301

Louisville, KY 40206

Petitioner Attorney

David R Houbre

Attorney at Clark and Washington, P.C. (Knoxville)

5401 Kingston Pike, Suite 610

Knoxville, TN 37919

Defendant Attorney

Terrill L Adkins

Attorney at Trammell, Adkins & Ward, PC

Post Office Box 51450

Knoxville, TN 37950-1450

 

Court Documents

28 #1

Exhibit

#28

(#28) First MOTION to Quash Subpoena by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Houbre, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by David R Houbre on behalf of GEICO Advantage Insurance Company (Houbre, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#26

(#26) Alias Summons Issued as to Lamonte Hardwick. (ABF) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#25

(#25) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Alias Summons by David Wade. (Aguiar, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#24

(#24) SUPPLEMENT to #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rocky Top Xpress, LLC. (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#23

(#23) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #13 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#13

(#22) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #13 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Terrill L Adkins on behalf of Daniel Roop (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Terrill L Adkins on behalf of Rocky Top Xpress, LLC (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/7/18. (c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar, Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC, 1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301, Louisville, KY 40206) (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/7/18. (c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar, Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC, 1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301, Louisville, KY 40206) (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/7/18. (c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar, Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC, 1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301, Louisville, KY 40206) (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lamonte Hardwick, Jabez Expediting & Logistics, Inc, Rocky Top Xpress, LLC, Daniel Roop. (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#2

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 8/9/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 8/10/2018 to indicate c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar (ABF). (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rocky Top Xpress, LLC, Daniel Roop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) First MOTION to Quash Subpoena by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Houbre, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by David R Houbre on behalf of GEICO Advantage Insurance Company (Houbre, David) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Alias Summons Issued as to Lamonte Hardwick. (ABF) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Alias Summons by David Wade. (Aguiar, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUPPLEMENT to #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rocky Top Xpress, LLC. (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #13 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER, defendants' motion to strike #14 is GRANTED as unopposed. The portions of plaintiffs' complaint praying for damages of "attorney fees" and "pre-judgment...interest" [Doc. 1, at 12 4, 5], is hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 9/6/18. (ADA) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jabez Expediting & Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rocky Top Xpress, LLC, Daniel Roop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Terrill L Adkins on behalf of Daniel Roop (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Terrill L Adkins on behalf of Rocky Top Xpress, LLC (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 8/9/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 8/10/2018 to indicate c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar (ABF). (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/7/18. (c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar, Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC, 1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301, Louisville, KY 40206) (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/7/18. (c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar, Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC, 1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301, Louisville, KY 40206) (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/7/18. (c/m to Craig Sam Aguiar, Sam Aguiar Injury Lawyers PLLC, 1201 Story Avenue, Suite 301, Louisville, KY 40206) (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Lamonte Hardwick, Jabez Expediting & Logistics, Inc, Rocky Top Xpress, LLC, Daniel Roop. (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by David Wade, Alishia Wright (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3036129.) by David Wade, Alishia Wright. (ABF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 Paid, Receipt #K3036129.), filed by Alishia Wright, David Wade. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(ABF) Modified on 9/6/2018 to note: The portions of plaintiffs' complaint praying for damages of "attorney fees" and "pre- judgment . . . interest" [Doc. 1, at 12 4, 5], is hereby STRICKEN per #21 . (ADA). (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less