This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:50 (UTC).

Wright v. Murphy et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Wright filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Murphy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nelva Gonzales Ramos and Jason B Libby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

Referral Judge

Jason B Libby

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tracy Jay Wright

Claimants

Donnie Williams

Bill Murphy

Matthew Murphy

Mary Murphy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert Myrick Browning, Jr

Attorney at Brown Sims PC

1177 W Loop S, 10Th Floor

Houston, TX 77027

Darah Eckert

Attorney at Brown Sims

1177 West Loop South, 10Th Floor

Houston, TX 77027

Claimant Attorneys

Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer

Attorney at Brunkenhoefer PC

500 North Shoreline Blvd., Suite 1100

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Douglas Dewitt McLallen, Sr.

Attorney at Anderson Lehrman et al

1001 Third St, Ste 1

Corpus Christi, TX 78404

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSE TO CLAIMANTS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY; Motion-related deadline set re: #17 MOTION to Lift Stay Response or a statement due by 11/2/2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

18 #2

Exhibit Oder

18 #1

Exhibit Stipulation

#18

(#18) STIPULATION re: Claimants' Claim, Jurisdiction and Damages by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Exhibit Oder)(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

17 #2

Proposed Order Oder

17 #1

Exhibit Stipulation

#17

(#17) MOTION to Lift StayMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Oder)(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#16

(#16) CLAIM FOR DAMAGES filed by Matthew Murphy, Mary Murphy, Bill Murphy, Donnie Williams.(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed.(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER re: #5 MOTION Order Directing Issuance of Monition, filed.(Eckert, Darah) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(idavis, 2) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#3

(#3) Intradistrict Transfer to Corpus Christi, filed. (dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) *THIS ENTRY WAS INCORRECTLY RECORDED AND HAS BEEN TERMINATED* ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1) Modified on 8/24/2018 (dnoriega, 1). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed.(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSE TO CLAIMANTS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY; Motion-related deadline set re: #17 MOTION to Lift Stay Response or a statement due by 11/2/2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION re: Claimants' Claim, Jurisdiction and Damages by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Exhibit Oder)(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Lift StayMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Oder)(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLAIM FOR DAMAGES filed by Matthew Murphy, Mary Murphy, Bill Murphy, Donnie Williams.(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bill Murphy, Mary Murphy, Matthew Murphy, Donnie Williams, filed.(Brunkenhoefer, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER NOTICE OF COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MONITION issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby), filed.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED ORDER granting #5 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED ORDER re: #5 MOTION Order Directing Issuance of Monition, filed.(Eckert, Darah) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Eckert, Darah) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tracy Jay Wright, filed.(Eckert, Darah) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF SETTING as to #5 MOTION Order Directing Issuance of Monition. Parties notified. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2018 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 361-693-6518. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (KendraPearson, 2) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF RESETTING. Parties notified. Telephonic Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 361-693-6518. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (KendraPearson, 2) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Order Directing Issuance of Monition by Tracy Jay Wright, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2018. (Eckert, Darah) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(idavis, 2) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Case transferred in from Brownsville Division on 08/30/2018 ; Case Number 1:18-cv-138.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Intradistrict Transfer to Corpus Christi, filed. (dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *THIS ENTRY WAS INCORRECTLY RECORDED AND HAS BEEN TERMINATED* ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1) Modified on 8/24/2018 (dnoriega, 1). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20732661) filed by Tracy Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.