This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 at 07:32:18 (UTC).

World Sports Alumni, Inc. v. National Football League et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 World Sports Alumni, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against National Football League. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karla R. Spaulding and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01451

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karla R. Spaulding

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

World Sports Alumni, Inc.

Defendants

Seneca McMillan

National Football League

National Football League Alumni Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexis Francisco Carter, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of Alexis F. Carter, P.A.

2014 East Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth M. Garcia

Attorney at Parker McCay, P.A.

9000 Midlantic Drive, Suite 300

Mount Laurel, NJ 08054

Joan Carlos Wizel

Attorney at Lydecker Diaz

1221 Brickell Ave 19Th Flr

Miami, FL 33131-3240

Megan Costa DeVault

Attorney at Akerman LLP

420 S Orange Ave., Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Monica Marie McNulty

Attorney at Akerman LLP

420 S Orange Ave., Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/21/2018. (ctp) (JLC) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of settlement by Seneca McMillan, National Football League Alumni Association (Wizel, Joan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Joan Carlos Wizel on behalf of Seneca McMillan, National Football League Alumni Association (Wizel, Joan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to National Football League by World Sports Alumni, Inc. (Murphy, Amanda) Modified on 9/21/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by National Football League. (DeVault, Megan) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#12

(#12) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

11 #3

Supplement

11 #2

Supplement

11 #1

Supplement

#11

(#11) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER to strike re: #6 Corporate disclosure statement filed by National Football League Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (ctp)(JLC) (ESG). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/7/2018. (ECJ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. National Football League answer or response due 9/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/7/2018. (ECJ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to counsel, Elizabeth M. Garcia, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LMM) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) **STRICKEN PER #10 ORDER** Rule 7.1 CORPORATE disclosure statement by National Football League. (LMM) Modified on 9/12/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Costa DeVault, Monica Marie McNulty on behalf of National Football League. (LMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against National Football League Alumni Association by World Sports Alumni, Inc. Originally filed in State Court 8/27/2018. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by National Football League. Originally filed in State Court 8/24/18. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/21/2018. (ctp) (JLC) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of settlement by Seneca McMillan, National Football League Alumni Association (Wizel, Joan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Joan Carlos Wizel on behalf of Seneca McMillan, National Football League Alumni Association (Wizel, Joan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to National Football League by World Sports Alumni, Inc. (Murphy, Amanda) Modified on 9/21/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by National Football League. (DeVault, Megan) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER to strike re: #6 Corporate disclosure statement filed by National Football League Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (ctp)(JLC) (ESG). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for National Football League. Answer due by 9/26/2018. (LMM) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/7/2018. (ECJ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. National Football League answer or response due 9/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/7/2018. (ECJ) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to counsel, Elizabeth M. Garcia, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LMM) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) **STRICKEN PER #10 ORDER** Rule 7.1 CORPORATE disclosure statement by National Football League. (LMM) Modified on 9/12/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Costa DeVault, Monica Marie McNulty on behalf of National Football League. (LMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against National Football League Alumni Association by World Sports Alumni, Inc. Originally filed in State Court 8/27/2018. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by National Football League. Originally filed in State Court 8/24/18. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Seneca McMillan, National Football League, National Football League Alumni Association filed by World Sports Alumni, Inc. Filed in State Court 7/9/2018.(LMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Joint NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2018-CA-7300-O filed in State Court on 7/9/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-76615 filed by National Football League Alumni Association, Seneca McMillan, National Football League. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Composite Exhibit B)(LMM) Modified on 9/7/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less