This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2018 at 05:53:24 (UTC).

Word v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 Word filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Word

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11509

Defendant Attorney

Cannon F. Allen

Attorney at Adams and Reese - TN

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 700

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

24 #1

*Restricted*

#24

(#24) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Western. Case number 2:17-cv-02812. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#23

(#23) MDL No. 2809 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) (agj) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#22

(#22) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 2/28/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman.(jpw) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to Amend filed by All Defendants. (Allen, Cannon) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/24/2018)

19 #1

Supplement Proposed Order

#19

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Propsoed Order filed by Patricia Word. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

18 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Allen, Cannon) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#8

(#8) ************OOPS! Erroneously attached image is hereby replaced to correct the record.************** Modified on 11/3/2017 (jld). [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2662508), filed by Patricia Word. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: DE 6 in (All Cases) 5:18-md-02809-KKC - MOTION to Stay Additional Deadlines in All Cases Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (TDA) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Western. Case number 2:17-cv-02812. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MDL No. 2809 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) (agj) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 2/28/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman.(jpw) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to Amend filed by All Defendants. (Allen, Cannon) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Patricia Word has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Proposed Orders are not to be published to CM/ECF. Proposed Orders are to be emailed to the presiding judges in word format. If no order previously submitted, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and Propsoed Order filed by Patricia Word. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Allen, Cannon) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Reissued as to McKesson Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***********OOPS! Erroneously attached image is hereby replaced to correct the record **********. Modified on 11/3/2017 (jld). [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ************OOPS! Erroneously attached image is hereby replaced to correct the record.************** Modified on 11/3/2017 (jld). [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2662508), filed by Patricia Word. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from tnwd on 2/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less