This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2018 at 08:12:59 (UTC).

Woods et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 Woods filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lois Woods

Michael Woods

Defendants

Refresco Group, N.V.

Refresco Beverages US, Inc.

Cott Beverages, Inc.

Cott Corporation

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick E. McFarland

Attorney at Patrick E. McFarland, PLLC

3011 Murdoch Ave.

Parkersburg, WV 26102

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J. Ennis

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

301 Grant St, 20Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-1410

Amanda W. Thai

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Liberty Place, 28Th Floor, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph G. Nogay

Attorney at Sellitti, Nogay & McCune

Po Box 3095

Weirton, WV 26062

Paul K. Leary, Jr.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Liberty Place, 28Th Floor, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Heather M. Noel

Attorney at MacCorkle Lavender PLLC - Morgantown

2004 White Willow Way

Morgantown, WV 26505

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V. identifying Corporate Parent Refresco US Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Refresco US Holding, Inc. for Cott Corporation.. (Nogay, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda W. Thai. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul K. Leary, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda W. Thai by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) Modified docket text re: atty. name on 10/26/2018 (nmm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul K. Leary, Jr. by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) Modified docket text re: atty. name on 10/26/2018 (nmm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint w/Affirmative Defenses by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V..(Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE: All Defendants to respond to Complaint by 10/17/18. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/17/18. (soa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/16/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2018. Discovery due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/12/18. (lmm) Modified on 9/12/2018 to REGEN NEF to Attorney Noel (lmm). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Court file

1 #3

Exhibit C - Stipulation of Consent

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, (case number 18-C-156), filed by Cott Corporation, Cott Beverages, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V., Refresco Beverages US, Inc. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2663467. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Consent, #4 Exhibit D - State Court file, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) Modified on 9/12/2018 to REGEN NEF to Attorney Noel (lmm). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V. identifying Corporate Parent Refresco US Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Refresco US Holding, Inc. for Cott Corporation.. (Nogay, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda W. Thai. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul K. Leary, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PHV Filing fee for Paul Leary and Amanda Thai: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002016 (lmm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda W. Thai by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) Modified docket text re: atty. name on 10/26/2018 (nmm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul K. Leary, Jr. by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Nogay, Joseph) Modified docket text re: atty. name on 10/26/2018 (nmm). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint w/Affirmative Defenses by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V..(Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE: All Defendants to respond to Complaint by 10/17/18. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/17/18. (soa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cott Beverages, Inc., Cott Corporation, Refresco Beverages US, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/16/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2018. Discovery due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/12/18. (lmm) Modified on 9/12/2018 to REGEN NEF to Attorney Noel (lmm). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, (case number 18-C-156), filed by Cott Corporation, Cott Beverages, Inc., Refresco Group, N.V., Refresco Beverages US, Inc. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2663467. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Consent, #4 Exhibit D - State Court file, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) Modified on 9/12/2018 to REGEN NEF to Attorney Noel (lmm). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less