This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2020 at 12:21:42 (UTC).

Wood et al v. Neidorff et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 Wood filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Neidorff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Noelle C. Collins and Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00393

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Noelle C. Collins

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laura Wood

Peoria Police Pension Fund

Petitioner

Harkishan Parekh

Defendants

Jeffrey A. Schwaneke

Centene Corporation

John R. Roberts

Richard A. Gephardt

David L. Steward

Frederick H. Eppinger

Robert K. Ditmore

Michael F. Neidorff

Tommy G. Thompson

Orlando Ayala

Vicki B. Escarra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Greg G. Gutzler

Attorney at DICELLO AND LEVITT LLC - Chicago

Ten N. Dearborn St., 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Geoffrey M. Johnson

Attorney at SCOTT AND SCOTT ATTORNEYS AT LAW LLP

2434 Cedar Rd., Suite 12

Cleveland Heights, OH 44106

Scott R. Jacobsen

Attorney at SCOTT AND SCOTT ATTORNEYS AT LAW LLP

2434 Cedar Rd., Suite 12

Cleveland Heights, OH 44106

Petitioner Attorney

Joseph V. Neill

5201 Hampton Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63109

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph P. Conran

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Christopher A. Smith

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL, LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

#15

92 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authori

#92

#29

#4

RESTRICTED

1 #13

Summons Centene Corporation

1 #12

Summons Schwaneke

1 #11

Summons Escarra

1 #6

Summons Roberts

1 #5

Summons Steward

1 #4

Summons Ditmore

1 #3

Summons Neidorff

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 91) by Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson, Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority)Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00113-CDP, 4:18-cv-00393-CDP, 4:18-cv-02085-RLW(Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER SETTING PLEADING AND MOTION SCHEDULE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule 26 is GRANTED as follows: 1. Defendants are not required to move against, answer or otherwise respond to either of the complaints at this time. 2. No later than January 11, 2019, counsel for plaintiff Harkishan Parekh and for plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund must meet and confer and attempt to resolve their competing claims to be lead plaintiff and lead counsel. a. If they can agree, they must, no later than January 22, 2019 file a joint motion for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel, setting out any agreement and why that is an appropriate resolution of this initial dispute, and setting out which of the two complaints should become the operative complaint in this matter or whether they agree to file a consolidated amended complaint. Any proposed consolidated amended complaint must be attached to the joint motion. b. Assuming no agreement is reached, then each plaintiff group must, no later than January 22, 2019, file a single motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and lead counsel and a statement whether, if that side is appointed lead plaintiff/counsel, they wish to proceed on their previously-filed complaint or wish to file an amended complaint. If they wish to file an amended complaint, the proposed amended complaint must be attached to that motion. Each side must also, by that same date, file a memorandum in support of its position, along with any declarations or other evidence it deems appropriate. The memoranda in support are limited to 20 pages each and must cover all issues (lead plaintiff, lead counsel, amendment) in that sides single memorandum. No later than February 13, 2019 the competing plaintiffs must file any briefs in opposition, which are limited to 15 pages in length. Any reply briefs must be filed no later than March 1, 2019 and are limited to 5 pages in length. These page limitations will not be extended. 3. If counsel believe any of this material should be filed under seal or should not be provided to any other party in the case, they must meet and confer with all counsel and seek to reach agreement for an appropriate protective order. If they are unable to agree, then they must file a joint motion for a protective order setting out the position of each party to the case no later than January 22, 2019. No further briefing will be allowed on the protective-order issue. 4. Defendants shall have 45 days after the Court Order resolving the issues of lead plaintiff, lead counsel and operative complaint, to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. 5. If defendants move to dismiss the complaint, lead plaintiff shall file its opposition no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. 6. Defendants shall file their reply to any opposition made by lead plaintiff no later than 30 days after the filing of lead plaintiff's opposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further briefs and pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 4:18CV113 CDP only, and the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close Case No. 4:18CV393 CDP, after docketing a copy of this order in that case. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/13/2018. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00113-CDP, 4:18-cv-00393-CDP(CBL) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Movants Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Appoint Lead Counsel (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate Case Number 4:18-cv-00393-CDP into Case Number 4:18-cv-00113-NAB. Following such consolidation, the Clerk is ordered to reassign the consolidated case to District Judge Catherine D. Perry, who has agreed to such reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/7/18. (KJS) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P. Conran for Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Conran, Joseph) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Joint Motion for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule by Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson, Movant Harkishan Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Centene Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith for Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh with case number 4:18-cv-00113 (Attachments: #1 Attachment PLAINTIFF HARKISHAN PAREKH'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL)(Neill, Joseph) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (KXS) (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motions for Pro Hac Vice (Docs. #9 , #10 ) filed by Geoffrey M. Johnson and Scott R. Jacobsen, counsel for Plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund, are GRANTED. Geoffrey M. Johnson and Scott R. Jacobsen are hereby admitted for the purpose of representing Plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 03/22/2018. (KBL) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott R. Jacobsen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6444183) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jacobsen, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Greg G. Gutzler for Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint pursuant to Local Rule 13.05 (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/14/2018. (KBL) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Docket(#6) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 11 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Greg G. Gutzler. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood with case number 4:18-cv-00113 (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document : Verified Shareholder Derivation Complaint by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document : Verified Shareholder Derivation Complaint by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood Process Server: Rick Eisen (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number 0865-6423261, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Neidorff, #4 Summons Ditmore, #5 Summons Steward, #6 Summons Roberts, #7 Summons Thompson, #8 Summons Eppinger, #9 Summons Gephardt, #10 Summons Ayala, #11 Summons Escarra, #12 Summons Schwaneke, #13 Summons Centene Corporation)(Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoria Police Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Centene Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph V. Neill