This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 15:10:35 (UTC).

Wolzen et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 Wolzen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph R. Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-04151

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph R. Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Janice W. Martin

Teresa Navarro

Mindy Tomlin

Sharon Lindahl

Michelle Mann

Louise Fuqua

Sheila Tillman

Janet Buell

Janie Lagrone

Tina Pascoe

Patricia Rosales

Maria Quintanilla

Mary Alice Nielson

Shirley Markley

Susan Hartline

Opal Bright

Betty Donovan

Defendants

Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC

Boston Scientific Corporation

Doe Manufacturers

113 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer R. Liakos

Attorney at ROBINSON CALCAGNIE & ROBINSON

Seventh Floor, 620 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

David E. Stanley

Attorney at REED SMITH

Suite 2900, 355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Natasha Sung

Attorney at REED SMITH

Suite 2900, 355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mayela Carmen Montenegro

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

Suite 1600, 5 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the California Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-01253. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Case transferred to Southern District of West Virginia. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Southern District of West Virginia*. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jjg) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • (#16) In light of the case being stayed the August 25, 2017 status conference is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/28/2017. (no document attached) (ecp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Staying Case and Dismissing Claims Against Boston Scientific [Doc. No. #6 , #12 , #13 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/27/2017. (jjg) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Janet Wolzen (Liakos, Jennifer) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stanley, David)Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC(pty:dft) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Nonresident Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Deanna Voss, #3 Declaration David E. Stanley)(Sung, Natasha) (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • (#11) The telephonic case management conference that was set by Judge Major for August 14, 2017 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/14/2017.(no document attached) (ecp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • (#10) Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/25/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes re: status of transfer of these cases to MDL. This conference will be held for cases 17cv1249, 17cv1250, 17cv1251 and 17cv1253. Counsel must lodge a single joint statement as to all cases, no longer than 3 pages, by 8/17/17 re: status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/14/2017. (no document attached) (ecp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE: Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes for all further proceedings. Judge William Q. Hayes no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 17cv1253-CAB-NLS. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/13/2017. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/10/2017. (3:17-cv-01249-CAB-NLS) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Sung, Natasha) (jao). (jjg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stanley, David)Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Astora Women's Health LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Health Solutions Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela)Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. of case(s) 3:17-cv-01249-CAB-NLS, 3:17-cv-01250-JAH-JMA, 3:17-cv-01251-BEN-BLM (AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASES). (Sung, Natasha) (mdc) (7/10/2017 - Proposed low # order prepared re lower-numbered case 17cv1249-CAB-NLS.) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Proposed Low Number Order not prepared - related cases in State Court. (knb) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (knb) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (knb) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court Of California, County Of San Diego, case number 37-2017-00001699-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10179572.), filed by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Answer, #4 Exhibit 3 - Initial Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proof of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:17-cv-1253-WQH-NLS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(knb) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/11/2017.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astora Women's Health is a litigant

Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natasha Sung

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Stanley