This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:45:23 (UTC).

Wolfe v. Express Scripts Holding Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Wolfe filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Express Scripts Holding Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01111

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Wolfe

Defendants

Thomas P. Mac Mahon

Nicholas J. LaHowchic

Frank Mergenthaler

Elder Granger

Express Scripts Holding Company

William L. Roper

Woodrow A. Myers, Jr.

Seymour Sternberg

Maura C. Breen

George Paz

Timothy Wentworth

Kathleen M. Mazzarella

William J. Delaney

Roderick A. Palmore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blake A. Bennett

Attorney at Cooch and Taylor

The Brandywine Building, 1000 N. West Street, 10Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STATUS REPORT by Robert Wolfe. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Seymour Sternberg served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Roderick A. Palmore served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Woodrow A. Myers, Jr served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Frank Mergenthaler served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Thomas P. Mac Mahon served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Nicholas J. LaHowchic served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Maura C. Breen served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. William J. Delaney served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Timothy Wentworth served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. George Paz served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#3

(#17) ORAL ORDER: Answers were due to be filed on 8/20/2018 (see D.I. #3 through #16 ), and to date none have been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter with the Court within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2018. (nms) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Maura C. Breen, William J. Delaney, Express Scripts Holding Company, Elder Granger, Nicholas J. LaHowchic, Thomas P. Mac Mahon, Kathleen M. Mazzarella, Frank Mergenthaler, Woodrow A. Myers, Jr, Roderick A. Palmore, George Paz, William L. Roper, Seymour Sternberg, Timothy Wentworth - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2427984.) - filed by Robert Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORAL ORDER: The request to file a further status report within 30 days (D.I. #18 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/4/2018. (nms) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STATUS REPORT by Robert Wolfe. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORAL ORDER: Answers were due to be filed on 8/20/2018 (see D.I. #3 through #16 ), and to date none have been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter with the Court within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2018. (nms) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Seymour Sternberg served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. William L. Roper served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Roderick A. Palmore served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Woodrow A. Myers, Jr served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Frank Mergenthaler served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Thomas P. Mac Mahon served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Nicholas J. LaHowchic served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Maura C. Breen served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. William J. Delaney served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Elder Granger served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Timothy Wentworth served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. George Paz served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Wolfe. Express Scripts Holding Company served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Maura C. Breen, William J. Delaney, Express Scripts Holding Company, Elder Granger, Nicholas J. LaHowchic, Thomas P. Mac Mahon, Kathleen M. Mazzarella, Frank Mergenthaler, Woodrow A. Myers, Jr, Roderick A. Palmore, George Paz, William L. Roper, Seymour Sternberg, Timothy Wentworth. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Maura C. Breen, William J. Delaney, Express Scripts Holding Company, Elder Granger, Nicholas J. LaHowchic, Thomas P. Mac Mahon, Kathleen M. Mazzarella, Frank Mergenthaler, Woodrow A. Myers, Jr, Roderick A. Palmore, George Paz, William L. Roper, Seymour Sternberg, Timothy Wentworth - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2427984.) - filed by Robert Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Express Scripts, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blake A. Bennett