This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:38:51 (UTC).

Wisser v. Morris Communications Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Wisser filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Morris Communications Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bill Wisser

Defendant

Morris Communications Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony D. Lehman

Attorney at Hudson, Parrot & Walker, LLC

3575 Piedmont Rd., Ne, Suite L100

Atlanta, GA 30305

Dorsey Reese Carson, Jr.

Attorney at Carson Law Group, PLLC

2870 Peachtree Road, Nw, #915-3234

Atlanta, GA 30305

Defendant Attorney

David E. Hudson

Attorney at Hull Barrett, PC

801 Broad Street, 7Th Floor, P.O. Box 1564

Augusta, GA 30903-1564

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bill Wisser. Responses due by 11/23/2018. (Lehman, Anthony) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Lehman on behalf of Bill Wisser (Lehman, Anthony) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE to Counsel of Record re: Attorney Appearance. (pts) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#14) Case transfer in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05262. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#12

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morris Communications Company, LLC. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morris Communications Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bill Wisser. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bill Wisser. Responses due by 11/23/2018. (Lehman, Anthony) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Dorsey Reese Carson, Jr on behalf of Bill Wisser (Carson, Dorsey) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Lehman on behalf of Bill Wisser (Lehman, Anthony) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Hudson on behalf of Morris Communications Company, LLC (Hudson, David) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Compliance re #16 due by 9/21/2018. (pts) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE to Counsel of Record re: Attorney Appearance. (pts) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Transfer of case. (pts) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transfer in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05262. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Georgia (cf) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/13/2018) (cf) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morris Communications Company, LLC. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morris Communications Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bill Wisser. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Morris Communications Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15185455)Document filed by Bill Wisser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less