This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2015 at 10:00:39 (UTC).

WILSON v. TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2014 WILSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD G. SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00920

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD G. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNE WILSON

Defendant

TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J. MURPHY

2341 Pennsylvania Avenue

Philadelphia, PA 19130

Defendant Attorneys

JESSICA HEINZ

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

ERNEST FRANK KOSCHINEG

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

AMANDA MALAMUD

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER PC

450 Sentry Pkwy Ste 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

DAVID G. VOLK

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER PC

450 Sentry Pkwy Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROBERT MURPHY from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number No. 070501135. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 096107) Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ks, ) Modified on 3/20/2014 (ks, ). (Entered: 02/18/2014)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT J. MURPHY. (MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ROBERT J. MURPHY.(fdc) (Entered: 03/04/2014)

4 #8

Exhibit

4 #7

Exhibit

4 #4

Exhibit

4 #3

Exhibit

#4

(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 First MOTION to Remand To Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (HEINZ, JESSICA) (Entered: 04/09/2014)

#15

(#15) Memorandum in support re #12 MOTION for Discovery and in opposition to Travelers Motion for Protective Order filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. VOLK on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA MALAMUD on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MALAMUD, AMANDA) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#19

(#19) Sur Reply to Robert Murphys Response Contra Travelers Request for a Protective Order filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Certificate of Service. (HEINZ, JESSICA) Modified on 8/29/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED; THE MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED; THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PA; THE MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IS DENIED; AND THE MOTION/REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED AS MOOT. TRAVELER'S REQUEST FOR THE PAYMENT OF JUST COSTS AND ANY ACTUAL EXPENSES, INCLUDING ATTORNEY'S FEES, INCURRED AS A RESULT OF THE REMOVAL IS GRANTED. TRAVELERS SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A BILL OF COSTS. MURPHY SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF SEVEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO THE BILL OF COSTS; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 3/30/15. 3/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE' AND E-MAILED. (ky, ) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

#21

(#21) OPINION/ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED; THE MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED; THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PA; THE MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IS DENIED; AND THE MOTION/REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED AS MOOT. TRAVELER'S REQUEST FOR THE PAYMENT OF JUST COSTS AND ANY ACTUAL EXPENSES, INCLUDING ATTORNEY'S FEES, INCURRED AS A RESULT OF THE REMOVAL IS GRANTED. TRAVELERS SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A BILL OF COSTS. MURPHY SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF SEVEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO THE BILL OF COSTS; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 3/30/15. 3/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE' AND E-MAILED. (ky, ) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

#22

(#22) BILL OF COSTS by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (HEINZ, JESSICA) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY. Motion, Memorandum Proposed Order, Exhibits and Certificate of Service.(MURPHY, ROBERT) Modified on 4/10/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#24

(#24) Objections by ROBERT J. MURPHY to Travelers Bill of Costs. (MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Objections by ROBERT J. MURPHY to Travelers Bill of Costs. (MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY. Motion, Memorandum Proposed Order, Exhibits and Certificate of Service.(MURPHY, ROBERT) Modified on 4/10/2015 (lisad, ). (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) BILL OF COSTS by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (HEINZ, JESSICA) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) OPINION/ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED; THE MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED; THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PA; THE MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IS DENIED; AND THE MOTION/REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED AS MOOT. TRAVELER'S REQUEST FOR THE PAYMENT OF JUST COSTS AND ANY ACTUAL EXPENSES, INCLUDING ATTORNEY'S FEES, INCURRED AS A RESULT OF THE REMOVAL IS GRANTED. TRAVELERS SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A BILL OF COSTS. MURPHY SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF SEVEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO THE BILL OF COSTS; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 3/30/15. 3/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE' AND E-MAILED. (ky, ) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED; THE MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED; THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PA; THE MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IS DENIED; AND THE MOTION/REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED AS MOOT. TRAVELER'S REQUEST FOR THE PAYMENT OF JUST COSTS AND ANY ACTUAL EXPENSES, INCLUDING ATTORNEY'S FEES, INCURRED AS A RESULT OF THE REMOVAL IS GRANTED. TRAVELERS SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A BILL OF COSTS. MURPHY SHALL HAVE A PERIOD OF SEVEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO THE BILL OF COSTS; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 3/30/15. 3/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE' AND E-MAILED. (ky, ) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Sur Reply to Robert Murphys Response Contra Travelers Request for a Protective Order filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Certificate of Service. (HEINZ, JESSICA) Modified on 8/29/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • (#18) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc, ) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA MALAMUD on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MALAMUD, AMANDA) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. VOLK on behalf of TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Memorandum in support re #12 MOTION for Discovery and in opposition to Travelers Motion for Protective Order filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Strike and Response to Travelers Reply in Support of its Motion for Remand filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (HEINZ, JESSICA) (Entered: 05/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDER OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO THE CALENDER OF THE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH; ETC.. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 4/22/14. 4/23/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Strike filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief exhibits 1-3 and cert of service)(MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 First MOTION to Remand To Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (HEINZ, JESSICA) (Entered: 04/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 First MOTION to Remand To Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY. (MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 First MOTION to Remand To Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas filed by ROBERT J. MURPHY. (MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First MOTION to Remand To Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(HEINZ, JESSICA) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ROBERT J. MURPHY.(fdc) (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT J. MURPHY. (MURPHY, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROBERT MURPHY from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number No. 070501135. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 096107) Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ks, ) Modified on 3/20/2014 (ks, ). (Entered: 02/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Margaret Heinz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest Frank Koschineg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID G. VOLK