This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2019 at 07:42:52 (UTC).

Wilson v. State of Montana et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Montana. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and Jeremiah C. Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

Jeremiah C. Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ray Dean Wilson

Butte, MT 59701

Defendants

County and City of Butte

State of Montana

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER. Response due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/4/2019. Mailed to Wilson at Iowa St address with form (TAG) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Mail sent to Wilson at BDC Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Wilson at address listed on docket and to BDC address written on envelope containing #1 (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#1

(#1) LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Ray Dean Wilson. (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER. Response due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/4/2019. Mailed to Wilson at Iowa St address with form (TAG) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail sent to Wilson at BDC Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Wilson at address listed on docket and to BDC address written on envelope containing #1 (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Ray Dean Wilson. (TAG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less