This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2018 at 07:17:28 (UTC).

Wilson v. Santos et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Santos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci M. Yandle and Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

Referral Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Wilson

Centralia, IL 62801

Defendants

Lana Nalewajka

Nurse Harrell

Tammy L. Tyler

Vipin Shah

Nurse Shoemaker

Venerio Santos

Wexford Health Sources Inc.

Nurse Beverly

Jane Doe

Jon Fatheree

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Larry Wilson.(jaj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Wilson. (jaj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number and filing fee requirements. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed IFP, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

3 #2

Consent to Magistrate Judge

3 #1

Motion to Proceed IFP

#4

(#6) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Wilson's affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's monthly income as of the date of filing is $732.91 (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff lists no other monthly expenses, and his average monthly balance ranges from over $600 to over $900 during the six month period immediately preceding the filing of this case. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee no later than September 21, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/22/2018. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/1/2018. (tjk) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Beverly on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#22

(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nurse Shoemaker waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#21

(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Venerio Santos waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#20

(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jon Fatheree waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nurse Beverly waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Lana Nalewajka waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (tjk) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Wexford Health Sources Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (tjk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#16

(#16) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wexford Health Sources, Inc. on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#15

(#15) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tammy L. Tyler on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#14

(#14) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Shoemaker on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nurse Shoemaker waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Venerio Santos waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jon Fatheree waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nurse Beverly waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Lana Nalewajka waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (tjk) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Wexford Health Sources Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (tjk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wexford Health Sources, Inc. on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tammy L. Tyler on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Shoemaker on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Vipin Shah on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jon Fatheree on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Beverly on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/1/2018. (tjk) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34625086527 (cds) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Wilson's affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's monthly income as of the date of filing is $732.91 (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff lists no other monthly expenses, and his average monthly balance ranges from over $600 to over $900 during the six month period immediately preceding the filing of this case. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee no later than September 21, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/22/2018. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Wilson. (jaj) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number and filing fee requirements. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed IFP, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Wilson. (jaj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Larry Wilson.(jaj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.