This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2018 at 07:34:57 (UTC).

Wilson v. PESG of Alabama LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Wilson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against PESG of Alabama LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Hughes Haikala and Liles C Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01535

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

Presiding Judge

Liles C Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roderick Wilson

Defendants

PESG Holding Company LLC

PESG of Alabama LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric J Artrip

Attorney at MASTANDO & ARTRIP LLC

301 Washington Street, Suite 302

Huntsville, AL 35801

Teresa Ryder Mastando

Attorney at MASTANDO & ARTRIP LLC

301 Washington Street, Suite 302

Huntsville, AL 35801

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan Stephens Hennig

Attorney at MAYNARD, COOPER & GALE

655 Gallatin Street, Sw

Huntsville, AL 35801

David B Block

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801-4936

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Roderick Wilson. (Mastando, Teresa) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by PESG Holding Company LLC, PESG of Alabama LLC. (Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#12

(#12) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/29/2018. (AHI) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

9 #1

Exhibit 1- First Amended Complaint

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Roderick Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- First Amended Complaint)(Mastando, Teresa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case is being reassigned from Judge Haikala to Judge Liles Burke. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1535-LCB on all subsequent pleadings(AHI) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PESG Holding Company LLC, PESG of Alabama LLC. filed by PESG Holding Company LLC, PESG of Alabama LLC (Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration of Norman Henry Bledsoe

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PESG Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Norman Henry Bledsoe)(Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PESG of Alabama LLC. filed by PESG of Alabama LLC (Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PESG of Alabama LLC.(Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued by the clerk and hand delivered to plaintiff for service as to PESG Holding Company LLC and PESG of Alabama LLC. (AHI) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Haikala until further notice. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1535-UJH-MHH on all subsequent pleadings (AHI) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against PESG Holding Company LLC, and PESG of Alabama LLC filed by Roderick Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Roderick Wilson. (Mastando, Teresa) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by PESG Holding Company LLC, PESG of Alabama LLC. (Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/29/2018. (AHI) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #9 Defendants have until November 7, 2018, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/24/2018. (KBW) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #6 Plaintiff has until November 7, 2018, to respond to defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/24/2018. (KBW) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Roderick Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- First Amended Complaint)(Mastando, Teresa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case is being reassigned from Judge Haikala to Judge Liles Burke. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1535-LCB on all subsequent pleadings(AHI) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PESG Holding Company LLC, PESG of Alabama LLC. filed by PESG Holding Company LLC, PESG of Alabama LLC (Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PESG Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Norman Henry Bledsoe)(Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PESG of Alabama LLC. filed by PESG of Alabama LLC (Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PESG of Alabama LLC.(Hennig, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued by the clerk and hand delivered to plaintiff for service as to PESG Holding Company LLC and PESG of Alabama LLC. (AHI) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3178452 (B4601092183). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against PESG Holding Company LLC, and PESG of Alabama LLC filed by Roderick Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHI). (Mastando, Teresa) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Haikala until further notice. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1535-UJH-MHH on all subsequent pleadings (AHI) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against PESG Holding Company LLC, and PESG of Alabama LLC filed by Roderick Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less