This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2018 at 07:26:52 (UTC).

Wilson v. GGNSC Rochester LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against GGNSC Rochester LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz, Katherine M. Menendez and Nancy E. Brasel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-02524

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Presiding Judges

Patrick J. Schiltz

Nancy E. Brasel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celia Wilson

Defendants

GGNSC Holdings LLC

GGNSC Administrative Services LLC

GGNSC Rochester LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew D Gross

Attorney at Kosieradzki Smith Law Firm

3675 Plymouth Blvd, Suite 105

Plymouth, MN 55446

Mark R Kosieradzki

Attorney at Kosieradzki Smith Law Firm, LLC

3675 Plymouth Blvd., Suite 105, Inactive

Plymouth, MN 55446

Defendant Attorneys

Rachelle A Velgersdyk

Attorney at Bowman & Brooke LLP

150 S 5Th St Ste 3000

Mpls, MN 55402

Alana K Bassin

Attorney at Bowman & Brooke LLP

150 S 5Th St Ste 3000

Mpls, MN 55402

Jennifer L Bullard

Attorney at Bowman & Brooke LLP

150 S 5Th St Ste 3000

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle A Velgersdyk on behalf of All Defendants. (Velgersdyk, Rachelle) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

12 #1

Consent Form

#12

(#12) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Rochester LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#10

(#10) GGNSC Rochester LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Rochester LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) GGNSC Holdings LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#6

(#6) GGNSC Administrative Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Rochester LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Andrew D. Gross re #1 Complaint, byCelia Wilson. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Rochester LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6338840) filed by Celia Wilson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle A Velgersdyk on behalf of All Defendants. (Velgersdyk, Rachelle) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Rochester LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) GGNSC Rochester LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Rochester LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) GGNSC Holdings LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) GGNSC Administrative Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and for Jury Trial filed by GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-02524-NEB-KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Rochester LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18-cv-2524 (PJS/KMM). (MMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of Andrew D. Gross re #1 Complaint, byCelia Wilson. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Rochester LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6338840) filed by Celia Wilson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D Gross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark R Kosieradzki