This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2019 at 07:02:24 (UTC).

Wilson v. Fidelity Management Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Wilson filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Fidelity Management Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-07425

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas K Wilson

Defendants

Fidelity Management Trust Company

Qorvo US, Inc.

Fidelity Workplace Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel L. Casas

Attorney at Casas Riley & Simonian, LLP

55 North 3Rd Street

Campbell, CA 95008

Anthony Francis Basile

Attorney at Casas Riley & Simonian, LLP

55 North 3Rd Street

Campbell, CA 95008

Defendant Attorneys

Julie Melissa Kamps

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Aaron Belzer

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#16

#14

#13

#12

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER GRANTING #17 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Kamps. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13072096.) filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc.. (Kamps, Julie) (Filed on 2/7/2019) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/4/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • (#15) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC.. (Belzer, Aaron) (Filed on 2/1/2019) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas K Wilson.. (Basile, Anthony) (Filed on 1/31/2019) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time for Filing Response filed by Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc.. (Belzer, Aaron) (Filed on 1/29/2019) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/1/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas K Wilson. All Defendants. (Basile, Anthony) (Filed on 1/11/2019) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Filing Response to Complaint filed by Thomas K Wilson. (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26E1SHPR by Thomas K Wilson. (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas K Wilson (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/24/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC, Qorvo US, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12915226.). Filed byThomas K Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Qorvo, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity Management Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Francis Basile