This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2018 at 07:36:29 (UTC).

Willis et al v. Cleveland County, North Carolina et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Willis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cleveland County, North Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00292

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sara E. Willis

Brian Willis

Defendants

Sam Lockridge

Cleveland County, North Carolina

Brian Epley

Dorothea Wyant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William E. Moore, Jr.

Attorney at Gray, Layton, Kersh, Solomon, Furr & Smith, PA

516 South New Hope Road, P.O. Box 2636

Gastonia, NC 28053

Defendant Attorney

Sam B. Craig

Attorney at Craig Law Firm, PLLC

Po Box 1861

Asheville, NC 28802

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrm.

1 #2

Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Ltr

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Sam Lockridge.(Craig, Samuel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sara E. Willis, Brian Willis. Sam Lockridge waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Moore, William) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sara E. Willis, Brian Willis. Dorothea Wyant waiver sent on 10/17/2018. (Moore, William) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (khm). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sara E. Willis, Brian Willis. Dorothea Wyant, Director, Cleveland County Health Dept., waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Moore, William) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (khm). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sara E. Willis, Brian Willis. Cleveland County, North Carolina waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Moore, William) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sara E. Willis, Brian Willis. Brian Epley waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Moore, William) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sam Lockridge on 10/17/2018 by Brian Willis, Sara E Willis. (Moore, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Brian Epley, Manager of Cleveland Co. on 10/17/2018 by Brian Willis, Sara E Willis. (Moore, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dorothea Wyant, Director Cleveland Co. Health Dpt. on 10/17/2018 by Brian Willis, Sara E Willis. (Moore, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dorthea Wyant on 10/17/2018 by Brian Willis, Sara E Willis. (Moore, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cleveland County, NC on 10/17/2018 by Brian Willis, Sara E Willis. (Moore, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3837820), filed by Sara E Willis, Brian Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrm., #2 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Ltr)(Moore, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less