This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2018 at 07:51:01 (UTC).

Williams v. Walmart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Williams filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Walmart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wallace Capel, Jr and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00874

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wiley Williams

Defendant

Walmart Stores East, LP

2 North Jackson Street, Suite 605

Montgomery, AL 36104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.

Attorney at McPhillips Shinbaum L.L.P.

P O Box 64

Montgomery, AL 36104

Chase Elliot Estes

Attorney at McPhillips Shinbaum LLP

516 S. Perry St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Wesley Clyde Redmond

Attorney at Ford Harrison, LLP

420 20Th Street North, Suite 2560

Birmingham, AL 35203

Susan Ware Bullock

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

2100 Southbridge Parkway; Suite 650

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two filed by Wiley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D's Position Statement)(McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

13 #1

Exhibit D's Position Statement

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/2/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#16

(#16) REPLY BRIEF re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 12/4/2018 to add the link to the #7 motion and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/28/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#12

(#12) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. as referral judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plf, if any there by, as to why the #7 Motion to Dismiss or Motion for More Definite Statement as to Count Two should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2018; Dft may file a reply on or before 11/30/2018; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/21/2018, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/2/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Walmart Stores East, LP. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Receipt

1 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint as to Count One by Walmart Stores East, LP.(Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/2/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050995.), filed by Wiley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wiley Williams; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wiley Williams re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

4 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wiley Williams; Walmart Stores East, LP served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY BRIEF re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 12/4/2018 to add the link to the #7 motion and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) TEXT ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; Dft's reply is due on or before 12/5/2018. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/30/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/28/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two filed by Wiley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D's Position Statement)(McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. as referral judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Wallace Capel, Jr.: #7 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plf, if any there by, as to why the #7 Motion to Dismiss or Motion for More Definite Statement as to Count Two should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2018; Dft may file a reply on or before 11/30/2018; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/21/2018, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/2/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Walmart Stores East, LP. (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney Wesley Clyde Redmond for Walmart Stores East, LP added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint as to Count One by Walmart Stores East, LP.(Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/2/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count Two by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/2/2018 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wiley Williams re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wiley Williams; Walmart Stores East, LP served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Wiley Williams; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Wiley Williams. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores East, LP and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wiley Williams. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050995.), filed by Wiley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.