This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:55:56 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. SCHOUPPE et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 WILLIAMS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against SCHOUPPE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maureen P. Kelly and Lisa Pupo Lenihan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01319

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Maureen P. Kelly

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORY BERNARD WILLIAMS

Aliquippa, PA 15001

Defendants

WILLIAM SCHOUPPE

ETHEL WHITE

JENNIFER MONZA

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/05/18. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff and Inmate Accounting this day, 10/05/18. (eca) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

Complaint lodged pending disposition of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly recused. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/10/18. (eca) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against JENNIFER MONZA, WILLIAM SCHOUPPE, ETHEL WHITE, filed by CORY BERNARD WILLIAMS. (jd) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

1 #1

Authorization

1 #4

Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CORY BERNARD WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #3 Document, #4 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan now presiding. (av) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly recused. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/10/18. (eca) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against JENNIFER MONZA, WILLIAM SCHOUPPE, ETHEL WHITE, filed by CORY BERNARD WILLIAMS. (jd) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/05/18. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff and Inmate Accounting this day, 10/05/18. (eca) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CORY BERNARD WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #3 Document, #4 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.