This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2018 at 07:06:26 (UTC).

Williams v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 Williams filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against RCN Telecom Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruben Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07038

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ruben Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcus Williams

Defendant

RCN Telecom Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shanita Quintrese Tiny Straw

Attorney at Golden Law

6602 Rosevelt Road

Oak Park, IL 60304

Victoria Christian Davis

Attorney at Golden Law

6602 W Roosevelt Rd

Oak Park, IL 60304

Defendant Attorneys

Becky Lynn Kalas

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

180 N Stetson Ave., Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60601

Craig R. Thorstenson

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

180 N Stetson Ave., Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Williams as to RCN Telecom Services, LLC on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marcus Williams by Victoria Christian Davis (Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RCN Telecom Services, LLC (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/4/2018. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/12/2018. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 12/18/2018 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing set for 11/20/2018 is stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Williams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15084513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marcus Williams by Shanita Quintrese Tiny Straw (Straw, Shanita) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#13

(#13) STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Marcus Williams (Straw, Shanita) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion by Becky Lynn Kalas for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC by Craig R. Thorstenson (Thorstenson, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/21/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by RCN Telecom Services, LLC(Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RCN Telecom Services, LLC (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Marcus Williams (Straw, Shanita) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint by RCN Telecom Services, LLC(Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/4/2018. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/12/2018. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 12/18/2018 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing set for 11/20/2018 is stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Motion by Becky Lynn Kalas for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC by Craig R. Thorstenson (Thorstenson, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Williams as to RCN Telecom Services, LLC on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC. (acm) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (ec, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marcus Williams by Shanita Quintrese Tiny Straw (Straw, Shanita) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marcus Williams by Victoria Christian Davis (Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Williams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15084513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Victoria) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less