This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2018 at 08:10:37 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 WILLIAMS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Lanzillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Lanzillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRY WILLIAMS

Defendants

DANIEL STROUP

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

PAUL NOEL

JOSEPH J. SILVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph P. Caulfield

Attorney at Mizner Law Firm

311 W. Sixth Street

Erie, PA 16503

John F. Mizner

Attorney at Mizner Firm

311 West Sixth Street

Erie, PA 16507

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel H. Foreman

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

4 Ppg Place, 5Th Floor, Two Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Benjamin M. Lombard

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby LLP

4 Ppg Place, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kelly J. Hoke

Attorney at Office of General Counsel, Department of Corrections

1920 Technology Parkway

Mechanicsburg, PA 17050

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REPLY BRIEF in Support to #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DANIEL STROUP. (Lombard, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/13/2018 to correct title of event selected. (ept) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#15

(#15) BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Stroup filed by BARRY WILLIAMS. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARRY WILLIAMS. PAUL NOEL waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019; JOSEPH j. SILVA waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Mizner, John) Modified text on 11/28/2018 to indicate waiver sent and answer due dates. (ept) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, DANIEL STROUP, JOSEPH J. SILVA, PAUL NOEL, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC answer due 12/11/2018; DANIEL STROUP answer due 12/11/2018; JOSEPH J. SILVA answer due 12/11/2018; PAUL NOEL answer due 12/11/2018, filed by BARRY WILLIAMS. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BARRY WILLIAMS. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J. Hoke on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL STROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by DANIEL STROUP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Lombard on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, DANIEL STROUP. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY BRIEF in Support to #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DANIEL STROUP. (Lombard, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/13/2018 to correct title of event selected. (ept) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from PAUL NOEL on 1/28/2019; JOSEPH j. SILVA on 1/28/2019. (ept) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Stroup filed by BARRY WILLIAMS. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARRY WILLIAMS. PAUL NOEL waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019; JOSEPH j. SILVA waiver sent on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Mizner, John) Modified text on 11/28/2018 to indicate waiver sent and answer due dates. (ept) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, DANIEL STROUP, JOSEPH J. SILVA, PAUL NOEL, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC answer due 12/11/2018; DANIEL STROUP answer due 12/11/2018; JOSEPH J. SILVA answer due 12/11/2018; PAUL NOEL answer due 12/11/2018, filed by BARRY WILLIAMS. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BARRY WILLIAMS. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Brief in Opposition due by 12/11/2018; Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/21/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J. Hoke on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Hoke, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment. Brief in Opposition due by 12/6/2018; Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/16/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL STROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by DANIEL STROUP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Lombard on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, DANIEL STROUP. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Erie County, case number 12743-18 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4918836), filed by DANIEL STROUP, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.