This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:55:16 (UTC).

Williams v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Williams filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02802

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marion Williams

Defendant

Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Clerk and Master Donna Russell

140 Adams, Ste 308

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PAUL ROBINSON

5 N. Third Street, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

Shaun Kevin Ramey

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE LLP

424 Church Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Summons by Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr on behalf of Marion Williams. (Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER #7 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/26/18. (shl) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 1/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Chancery Court of Shelby County, TN, case number CH-18-1543-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2926236), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#18

(#18) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 2 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/26/2019. (tlh) Modified on 1/9/2019 (tlh). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

#14

(#14) Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#12

(#12) Proposed Pretrial Order (Scheduling Order) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit A

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 2 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/26/2019. (tlh) Modified on 1/9/2019 (tlh). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • (#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2019. Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr. appearing for the plaintiff. Shaun Kevin Ramey appearing by telephone for Defendant. Dates/Deadlines established: Jury Trial set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 2 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/26/2019. Scheduling order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo)(9:10-9:21) (tlh) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/8/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Summons by Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr on behalf of Marion Williams. (Robinson, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Proposed Pretrial Order (Scheduling Order) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 1/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER #7 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/26/18. (shl) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note: Proposed orders should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no order previously emailed, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Chancery Court of Shelby County, TN, case number CH-18-1543-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2926236), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.