This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2018 at 05:50:36 (UTC).

Williams v. Hammers et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hammers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01075

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tremain Williams

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

. Crum

. Rose

. Perkins

. Botrell

. Johnson

. Dirck

Brian Baca

Robbie Johnson

. Bailas

. Valentine

. Arnette

Justin Hammers

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tremain Williams. Responses due by 3/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tremain Williams. Responses due by 3/6/2018. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Tremain Williams.(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

1 #5

Notice

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against. Arnette, Brian Baca,. Bailas,. Botrell,. Crum,. Dirck, Justin Hammers,. Johnson, Robbie Johnson,. Perkins,. Rose,. Valentine, filed by Tremain Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/20/2018. Plaintiff's Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $3.77. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (Copy mailed to the trust fund department at IL River CC) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tremain Williams. Responses due by 3/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tremain Williams. Responses due by 3/6/2018. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Tremain Williams. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Tremain Williams.(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against. Arnette, Brian Baca,. Bailas,. Botrell,. Crum,. Dirck, Justin Hammers,. Johnson, Robbie Johnson,. Perkins,. Rose,. Valentine, filed by Tremain Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less