This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2018 at 07:42:24 (UTC).

Williams v. Chatham Counter Narcotics Team et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Chatham Counter Narcotics Team. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and G. R. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

G. R. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jabbar M.A. Williams

Savannah, GA 31415

Defendants

Judge Michael Karpf

The Federal Bureau of Investigation

Judge Penny Hass Freesemann

Attorney Steven Sparger

James Byrne on behalf of the Jame Byrne Law Firm

ADA Ian Heap

District Attorney Meg Heap

Lt. George Gundich

Judge Claire Williams

Attorney Gilbert Stacy

Attorney Martin Hilliard on Behalf of the Martin Hilliard Law Firm

Attorney James Byrne

Jackson and Schiavoni Law Firm

Attorney Martin Hilliard

Attorney Michael Schiavoni

Attorney Courtney Lerch

FBI Agent Chris Blair

The Wade Law Firm

13 Unknown Garden City Police Officers

16 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

7 #3

Exhbits 27-28

7 #2

Exhbits 14-21

7 #1

Exhibits 1-13

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13, #2 Exhbits 14-21, #3 Exhbits 27-28)(jrb) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT and request for injunction against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams.(jrb) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jrb) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Delcaratory Judgment by Jabbar M.A. Williams. Responses due by 8/3/2018. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Legal Aid and Financial Resources by Jabbar M.A. Williams. Responses due by 8/3/2018. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jabbar M.A. Williams. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13, #2 Exhbits 14-21, #3 Exhbits 27-28)(jrb) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT and request for injunction against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams.(jrb) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jrb) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Delcaratory Judgment by Jabbar M.A. Williams. Responses due by 8/3/2018. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Legal Aid and Financial Resources by Jabbar M.A. Williams. Responses due by 8/3/2018. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jabbar M.A. Williams. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jabbar M.A. Williams.(jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less