This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:47:05 (UTC).

Williams, Jr. v. Seton Family of Hospitals et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Williams, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Seton Family of Hospitals. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00593

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leon Williams, Jr.

Defendants

Seton Family of Hospitals

Jason A. Bradley, M.D.

Seton Family of Hospitals doing business as Dell Seton Medical Center at the University of Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rockne W. Onstad

Attorney at The Onstad Law Firm

119 Ranch Road 620 South

Austin, TX 78734-3920

Defendant Attorneys

Yvonne K. Puig

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

98 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Daphne Marie Andritsos

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

98 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Joel J. Steed

5910 N. Central Expressway, Suite 650

Dallas, TX 75206

Paula K. Hale

Attorney at Steed Dunnill Reynolds Murphy Lamberth LLP

303 Camp Craft Road, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Seton Family of Hospitals, re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#22

(#22) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dl) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#21

(#21) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#20

(#20) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#19

(#19) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION to Strike #15 Reply to Response to Motion by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jason A. Bradley, M.D., re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jason A. Bradley, M.D. (Hale, Paula) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#8

(#14) RESPONSE in Support, filed by Seton Family of Hospitals, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Williams, Jr. Jason A. Bradley, M.D. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Williams, Jr. All Defendants. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Jason A. Bradley, M.D.. (dl) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Seton Family of Hospitals. (dl) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Williams, Jr. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Williams, Jr. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11011103), filed by Leon Williams, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Onstad, Rockne) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 7/16/2018) (cj). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Seton Family of Hospitals, re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dl) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Strike #15 Reply to Response to Motion by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jason A. Bradley, M.D., re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jason A. Bradley, M.D. (Hale, Paula) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jason A. Bradley, M.D., re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jason A. Bradley, M.D. (Hale, Paula) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Support, filed by Seton Family of Hospitals, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Williams, Jr. Jason A. Bradley, M.D. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Williams, Jr. All Defendants. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Jason A. Bradley, M.D.. (dl) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Seton Family of Hospitals. (dl) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Williams, Jr. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Williams, Jr. (Onstad, Rockne) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leon Williams, Jr. (cj) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11011103), filed by Leon Williams, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Onstad, Rockne) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 7/16/2018) (cj). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rockne W. Onstad