This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:42 (UTC).

Wilkie v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Wilkie filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Amica Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and Dennis Howell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00239

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

Dennis Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert V. Wilkie

Valdese, NC 28690

Defendant

Amica Mutual Insurance Company

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER that Plaintiffs' #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis is allowed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/11/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/11/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Amica Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Robert V. Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope)(kby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #3 Proposed Consent to Magistrate) (kby). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #3

Proposed Consent to Magistrate

1 #2

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/11/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that Plaintiffs' #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis is allowed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/11/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert V. Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kby). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Amica Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Robert V. Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope)(kby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #3 Proposed Consent to Magistrate) (kby). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.