This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2018 at 07:31:51 (UTC).

Wight et al v. D'Amante Pellerin Associates et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Wight filed an Other lawsuit against D'Amante Pellerin Associates. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul J. Barbadoro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00812

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul J. Barbadoro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Clean and Green Recovery Services

233 Buck Street

Pembroke, NH 03275

Phillip Wight

Pembroke, NH 03275

Defendants

Keith Richard

Democratic Senate Department for NH

Governor Hassan's Citizen's Dept

Supplemental Security Income

Vocational Rehabilitation

NH Legal Aid

Small Business Development

NH Dept of HHS

TD Bank North

Vocational Rehabilitation - State of NH

SSI - Supplement Security Income

Governor Hassan's Citizen's Department

NH Dept Health and Human Services

D'Amante Pellerin Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn M. Bradley

Attorney at Bruce J. Marshall Law Offices PLLC

48 Grandview Road, Suite 3

Bow, NH 03304

T. David Plourde

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Russell F. Hilliard

Attorney at Upton & Hatfield LLP

159 Middle St

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo

Attorney at Upton & Hatfield LLP

10 Centre St, Po Box 1090

Concord, NH 03302-1090

Karyl Roberts Martin

Attorney at University System of New Hampshire

25 Concord Rd

Lee, NH 03861

Jeanine M. Girgenti

Attorney at University System of New Hampshire

5 Chenell Drive, Suite 301

Concord, NH 03301

Elizabeth M. Lacombe

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 Pearl St, Ste 1415

Hartford, CT 06103

Francis Charles Fredericks

Attorney at NH Attorney General's Office (Civil)

33 Capitol St

Concord, NH 03301-6397

Hilary Holmes Rheaume

Attorney at Bernstein Shur PA

670 N Commercial St, Po Box 1120

Manchester, NH 03105-1120

Andru H. Volinsky

Attorney at Bernstein Shur PA

670 N Commercial St, Po Box 1120

Manchester, NH 03105-1120

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#28

#24

#16

#8

3 #1

2 of 2

#3

#2

1 #5

Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Letter to the State Court Clerk

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Recusal of Judge Barbadoro filed by Phillip Wight. Served on 11/6/2018 via CM/ECF. Follow up on Objection on 11/20/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Waive Reporters Fee filed by Phillip Wight. Served on 11/6/2018 via CM/ECF. Follow up on Objection on 11/20/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. MOTION HEARING held on 11/5/2018 Order to issue. Pretrial Conference not held. (Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey) (Pltfs Atty: Phillip Wight, pro se) (Defts Atty: T. David Plourde, Francis Charles Fredericks, Andru H. Volinsky, Hilary Holmes Rheaume, Jeanine M. Girgenti, Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo, Elizabeth M. Lacombe, Kathryn M. Bradley)(Total Hearing Time: 1 hour, 10 minutes) (js) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Francis Charles Fredericks on behalf of NH Dept Health and Human Services, Vocational Rehabilitation - State of NH Attorney Francis Charles Fredericks added to party NH Dept Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Francis Charles Fredericks added to party Vocational Rehabilitation - State of NH(pty:dft).(Fredericks, Francis) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Pending Motions to Dismiss filed by SSI - Supplement Security Income. Follow up on Objection on 10/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Plourde, T.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeanine M. Girgenti on behalf of Small Business Development Attorney Jeanine M. Girgenti added to party Small Business Development(pty:dft).(Girgenti, Jeanine) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE re: #7 MOTION to Substitute Party, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel with Financial Affidavit, #16 MOTION to Change Venue, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #24 MOTION to Dismiss, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TD Bank North. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 10/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lacombe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Disclosure Statement by TD Bank North disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lacombe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Small Business Development. Follow up on Objection on 10/23/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Martin, Karyl) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Supplemental Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by SSI - Supplement Security Income.(Plourde, T.) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to September 25, 2018 re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 9/25/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 10, 2018 filed by Small Business Development. Attorney Karyl Roberts Martin added to party Small Business Development(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 10/3/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martin, Karyl) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to September 25, 2018 filed by SSI - Supplement Security Income. Follow up on Objection on 10/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Plourde, T.) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2018-CV-00437, Merrimack County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 2 of 2)(Plourde, T.) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE - Local Rule 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association, or trust may not appear in any action pro se, re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Signed by Megan Cahill, Deputy Clerk. Compliance Deadline set for 10/3/2018. (mc) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. All Clean and Green Recovery Services shall file a disclosure statement by October 2, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 10/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-812-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Merrimack Superior Court, case number 217-2108-CV-00437 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by Supplemental Security Income. Answer Follow Up on 10/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Letter to the State Court Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Plourde, T.) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis Charles Fredericks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth M Lacombe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. David Plourde