This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:58:14 (UTC).

Wiblin v. Western Regional Jail Authority et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Wiblin filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Western Regional Jail Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl A. Eifert and Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01439

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl A. Eifert

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jace Wiblin

Barboursville, WV 25504

Defendants

Captain Aldrage

Any CO that has worked in A5 section

Captain Savilla

Western Regional Jail Authority

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT. (jsa)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

#1

(#1) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to open a new civil action for each of the plaintiffs in civil action 3:18-cv-01412, listing the same defendants as those named therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/15/2018. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; notifying Plaintiff that no action will occur on his Complaint until the fee is paid or the application is approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/28/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; notifying Plaintiff that no action will occur on his Complaint until the fee is paid or the application is approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/28/2018. (cc: Plaintiff with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT. (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to open a new civil action for each of the plaintiffs in civil action 3:18-cv-01412, listing the same defendants as those named therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 11/15/2018. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.