This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Whitserve LLC V. eNom, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Whitserve LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against eNom, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory M. Sleet. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00194

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory M. Sleet

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Whitserve LLC

Defendant

eNom, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Two Fox Point Centre, 6 Denny Road, Suite 307

Wilmington, DE 19809

Natasha Rodriguez

Michael J. Kosma

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Whitserve LLC. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,895,468; 6,182,078 B1. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natasha Rodriguez - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against eNom, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2314249.) - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 23, 2018 - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Kosma - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whitserve LLC. eNom, LLC served on 2/2/2018, answer due 2/23/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Kosma,Natasha Rodriguez for Whitserve LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, ) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED - re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 23, 2018 filed by Whitserve LLC, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natasha Rodriguez filed by Whitserve LLC, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Kosma filed by Whitserve LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: eNom, LLC answer due 4/23/2018.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/26/2018. (mdb) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 23, 2018 - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natasha Rodriguez - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Kosma - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00193-UNA, 1:18-cv-00194-UNA(nms) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whitserve LLC. eNom, LLC served on 2/2/2018, answer due 2/23/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to eNom, LLC on 2/2/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Whitserve LLC. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,895,468; 6,182,078 B1. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against eNom, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2314249.) - filed by Whitserve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmfn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.