This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2018 at 06:02:43 (UTC).

Whiteside et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 Whiteside filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Executor

Shirley Whiteside

Defendants

AstraZeneca LP

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Executor Attorneys

Eric T. Chaffin

Attorney at Chaffin Luhana LLP

3200 Main Street

Weirton, WV 26062

Jonathan Michael Sedgh

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, PC

700 Broadway, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10003

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Summons submitted as to AstraZeneca LP

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Eastern District of Kentucky transferring this action to the USDC/EDKY for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/29/2018. (cc: attys) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2018)

3 #2

Summons issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

#7

(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00500. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 05/30/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13), MDL 2809. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Shirley Whiteside, Louvenia Gray for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re: #1 Complaint for Damages. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to AstraZeneca LP, #2 Summons submitted as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6348221. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

2 #2

Summons submitted as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

7 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint for Damages. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to AstraZeneca LP, #2 Summons issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

3 #1

Summons issued as to AstraZeneca LP

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (TDA) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00500. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Eastern District of Kentucky transferring this action to the USDC/EDKY for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/29/2018. (cc: attys) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13), MDL 2809. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018. Complete information regarding the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #h ttp://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVSD e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after June 11, 2018. Please log in to the WVSD CM/ECF system at #http://ecf.wv sd.uscourts.gov before June 7, 2018 to make sure you know your current WVSD e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2018
  • IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018. Complete information regarding the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #h ttp://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information. Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the new WVSD NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVSD e-filing attorneys once the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVSD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step can't be completed until on or after June 11, 2018. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on June 11, 2018: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or, 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVSD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent at a later date on how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 04/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint for Damages. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to AstraZeneca LP, #2 Summons issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Shirley Whiteside, Louvenia Gray for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re: #1 Complaint for Damages. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to AstraZeneca LP, #2 Summons submitted as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6348221. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/30/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.