This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:51:51 (UTC).

White v. FCI Berlin, Warden

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 White filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against FCI Berlin, Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea K. Johnstone and Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00767

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher White

Berlin, NH 03570

Respondent

FCI Berlin, Warden

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

#1

(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Envelope) (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#2) NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution. NOTICE Signed by Megan Cahill, Deputy Clerk. Compliance Deadline set for 10/29/2018. (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $ 5 (Check), receipt number 14649016870 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. New case number is 1:18-cv-767-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution. NOTICE Signed by Megan Cahill, Deputy Clerk. Compliance Deadline set for 10/29/2018. (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Envelope) (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.