Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:29:41 (UTC).

White Coat Waste Project v. Maryland Department of Transportation et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 White Coat Waste Project filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Maryland Department of Transportation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03035

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White Coat Waste Project

Defendants

Maryland Transportation Administration

Maryland Department of Transportation

Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission

Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Curtis B Cooper

Attorney at The Law Office of Curtis Cooper LLC

400 Washington Ave Ste 200

Towson, MD 21204

Matthew Strugar

Attorney at Law Offices of Matthew Strugar

3435 Wilshire Blvd. Ste. 2910

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Mark Hunter Churchill

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

1650 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1700

Tysons, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, until December 21, 2018, by Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Churchill, Mark) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hunter Churchill on behalf of Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland (Churchill, Mark) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by White Coat Waste Project. Maryland Transportation Administration waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by White Coat Waste Project. Maryland Department of Transportation waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Maryland Transportation Administration on 10/22/2018 by White Coat Waste Project. Waiver of Service due by 11/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Maryland Department of Transportation on 10/22/2018 by White Coat Waste Project. Waiver of Service due by 11/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#7

(#7) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Strugar by White Coat Waste Project. The fee has already been paid.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#6

(#6) QC NOTICE: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by White Coat Waste Project needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by White Coat Waste Project (Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Strugar (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7594343.) by White Coat Waste Project(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #6

Summons For Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission

1 #5

Summons For Regional Transportation Authority of Central Maryland

1 #4

Summons For Maryland Transportation Administration

1 #3

Summons For Maryland Department of Transportation

1 #2

Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interest

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission, Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Administration, Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7594339.), filed by White Coat Waste Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interest, #3 Summons For Maryland Department of Transportation, #4 Summons For Maryland Transportation Administration, #5 Summons For Regional Transportation Authority of Central Maryland, #6 Summons For Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission)(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until December 21, 2018. Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/28/2018. (vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, until December 21, 2018, by Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Churchill, Mark) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hunter Churchill on behalf of Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland (Churchill, Mark) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by White Coat Waste Project. Maryland Transportation Administration waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by White Coat Waste Project. Maryland Department of Transportation waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Maryland Transportation Administration on 10/22/2018 by White Coat Waste Project. Waiver of Service due by 11/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Maryland Department of Transportation on 10/22/2018 by White Coat Waste Project. Waiver of Service due by 11/21/2018.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew Strugar. Directing attorney Matthew Strugar to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Strugar by White Coat Waste Project. The fee has already been paid.(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) QC NOTICE: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by White Coat Waste Project needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by White Coat Waste Project (Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) QC NOTICE: DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTEREST was filed as an attachment to #1 Complaint by White Coat Waste Project in ERROR. **Please re-file Disclosure of Corporate Interest separately using the civil event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" found in Other Filings - Other Documents. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission, Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Administration, Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Strugar (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7594343.) by White Coat Waste Project(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission, Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Administration, Regional Transportation Agency of Central Maryland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7594339.), filed by White Coat Waste Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interest, #3 Summons For Maryland Department of Transportation, #4 Summons For Maryland Transportation Administration, #5 Summons For Regional Transportation Authority of Central Maryland, #6 Summons For Central Maryland Transportation & Mobility Commission)(Cooper, Curtis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maryland Department of Transportation is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Hunter Churchill