This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 14:14:54 (UTC).

Wheeler v. www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Wheeler filed an Other lawsuit against www Urban Inc , a Texas corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02847

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Wheeler

Defendants

www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation

www.urban Inc.

www.urban Inc. doing business as Urban Living

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Terrel Johnson

Attorney at Terrel Law Group PLLC

8303 Southwest Frwy, No 450

Houston, TX 77074

Defendant Attorneys

Ana Tagvoryan

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Centur Park E, 6Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Munira Jesani

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Ave, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Harrison M Brown

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park E, 6Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by www.urban Inc., filed.(Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#13

(#13) DESIGNATION of Harrison M. Brown as attorney in charge of www.urban Inc., filed.(Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Harrison M. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/19/2018) (ealexander, 4). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted an extension of 3 weeks, from September 20, 2018 to October 11, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by www.urban Inc., filed.(Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by www.urban Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Harrison M. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice by www.urban Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Jesani, Munira) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/19/2018) (ealexander, 4). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by www.urban Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Munira A. Jesani on behalf of www.urban Inc., filed. (Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Andrew Wheeler, filed.(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation, filed.(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20688507) filed by Andrew Wheeler.(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by www.urban Inc., filed.(Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DESIGNATION of Harrison M. Brown as attorney in charge of www.urban Inc., filed.(Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Harrison M. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/19/2018) (ealexander, 4). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted an extension of 3 weeks, from September 20, 2018 to October 11, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by www.urban Inc., filed.(Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by www.urban Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Harrison M. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice by www.urban Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Jesani, Munira) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/19/2018) (ealexander, 4). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by www.urban Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Munira A. Jesani on behalf of www.urban Inc., filed. (Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Summons Issued as to www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Andrew Wheeler, filed.(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation, filed.(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against www.Urban Inc., a Texas corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20688507) filed by Andrew Wheeler.(Johnson, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anahit Tagvoryan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harrison Maxwell Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Munira A. Jesani