This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2018 at 05:20:01 (UTC).

Wheeler v. MA Dept. Public Safety et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2018 Wheeler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MA Dept Public Safety. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-10913

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Scott Wheeler

Athol, MA 01334

Defendants

Charles Bristol

FBI Boston Field Office

Governor Charlie Baker

Commonwealth of MA. Dept. of Correction

Federal Bureau of Investigation Boston

MA Dept. Public Safety

MA Dept. Corrections

 

Court Documents

8 #1

*Attachment*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02674. (Entered: 05/08/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) LETTER from Jeffrey S. Wheeler, dated 4/30/18 re: REQUEST JUDICIAL REVIEW URGENT. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sc) (Entered: 05/02/2018)

#6

(#6) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. This Court defers to the transferee court with respect to rulings on Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees, and with respect to any other pending motion. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/27/2018) (rdz) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#5

(#5) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION in Support re: #3 MOTION for Return of Property. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler. (rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Return of Property. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Charlie Baker, Charles Bristol, Commonwealth of MA. Dept. of Correction, FBI Boston Field Office, Federal Bureau of Investigation Boston, MA Dept. Corrections, MA Dept. Public Safety. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • (#11) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • (#10) Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 5/8/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-10913. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • (#9) Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02674. (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER from Jeffrey S. Wheeler, dated 4/30/18 re: REQUEST JUDICIAL REVIEW URGENT. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sc) (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #6 Transfer Order (case opening only) to Jeffrey Scott Wheeler, 253 South Street, Athol, MA 01334. (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Massachusetts. (rdz) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rdz) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #6 Transfer Order (case opening only), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rdz) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. This Court defers to the transferee court with respect to rulings on Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees, and with respect to any other pending motion. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/27/2018) (rdz) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION in Support re: #3 MOTION for Return of Property. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler. (rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Return of Property. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Charlie Baker, Charles Bristol, Commonwealth of MA. Dept. of Correction, FBI Boston Field Office, Federal Bureau of Investigation Boston, MA Dept. Corrections, MA Dept. Public Safety. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeffrey Scott Wheeler.(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Charlie Baker is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Investigation is a litigant