This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2018 at 07:07:04 (UTC).

Westwood One, LLC v. PMCapital.com, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/08/2018 Westwood One, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PMCapital com, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-09191

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westwood One, LLC

Defendant

PMCapital.com, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Schuyler Reiner

Attorney at Hand Baldachin & Amburgey LLP

8 West 40Th St., 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorney

Khail Parris

Attorney at Parris Law Firm

43364 10Th Street West

Lancaster, CA 93534

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by PMCapital.com, LLC.(Parris, Khail) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#14

(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PMCapital.com, LLC.(Parris, Khail) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

13 #2

Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

13 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#13

(#13) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Khail A. Parris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16001857. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PMCapital.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Parris, Khail) Modified on 12/6/2018 (wb). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#12

(#12) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Marc S. Reiner dated December 4, 2018 re: Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for December 11, 2018 at 11:15 a.m.. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#11

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against PMCapital.com, LLC.Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories served on PMCapital.com, LLC on October 17, 2018. Service was accepted by Jill Carter. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. PMCapital.com, LLC served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. Service was accepted by Grant Carter. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/12/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Within seven days of this Order, plaintiff may serve upon PMCapital.com, LLC an interrogatory limited to the citizenship of all natural persons who are its members, and, if any corporation is a member, the jurisdiction under whose laws it is incorporated and the principal place of business. PMCapital.com, LLC shall have seven days to respond to the interrogatory. Within thirty days of this Order, the plaintiff limited liability company shall amend its complaint to allege the citizenship of each of its own constituent members, as well as the citizenship of each member of the defendant limited liability company, or the action will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/11/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PMCapital.com, LLC. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PMCapital.com, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cumulus Media Inc. for Westwood One, LLC. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marc Schuyler Reiner to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#1

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against PMCapital.com, LLC.Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Khail A. Parris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16001857. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by PMCapital.com, LLC.(Parris, Khail) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PMCapital.com, LLC.(Parris, Khail) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Khail A. Parris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16001857. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PMCapital.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Parris, Khail) Modified on 12/6/2018 (wb). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Marc S. Reiner dated December 4, 2018 re: Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for December 11, 2018 at 11:15 a.m.. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against PMCapital.com, LLC.Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories served on PMCapital.com, LLC on October 17, 2018. Service was accepted by Jill Carter. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. PMCapital.com, LLC served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. Service was accepted by Grant Carter. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/12/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Within seven days of this Order, plaintiff may serve upon PMCapital.com, LLC an interrogatory limited to the citizenship of all natural persons who are its members, and, if any corporation is a member, the jurisdiction under whose laws it is incorporated and the principal place of business. PMCapital.com, LLC shall have seven days to respond to the interrogatory. Within thirty days of this Order, the plaintiff limited liability company shall amend its complaint to allege the citizenship of each of its own constituent members, as well as the citizenship of each member of the defendant limited liability company, or the action will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/11/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PMCapital.com, LLC. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Marc Schuyler Reiner to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PMCapital.com, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cumulus Media Inc. for Westwood One, LLC. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiner, Marc) Modified on 10/9/2018 (pne). (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PMCapital.com, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15672414)Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTWOOD ONE, INC. is a litigant