This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2018 at 07:17:53 (UTC).

Westwood One, LLC v. NPN Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Westwood One, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NPN Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-09375

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westwood One, LLC

Defendant

NPN Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Schuyler Reiner

Attorney at Hand Baldachin & Amburgey LLP

8 West 40Th St., 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) NPN Group, Inc.. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court (Initial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/2018) (jca) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NPN Group, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NPN Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cumulus Media Inc. for Westwood One, LLC. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NPN Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15742202)Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) NPN Group, Inc.. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court (Initial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/2018) (jca) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NPN Group, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NPN Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cumulus Media Inc. for Westwood One, LLC. Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NPN Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15742202)Document filed by Westwood One, LLC.(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTWOOD ONE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Schuyler Reiner