This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:43:06 (UTC).

Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC v. Stryker Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Stryker Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02604

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC

Defendant

Stryker Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jett Williams, III

Attorney at Henke, Williams & Boll, LLP

2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 3900

Houston, TX 77019

Charles Lee Henke, Jr

Attorney at Henke, Williams & Boll, LLP

2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 3900

Houston, TX 77019

Colin Sayer Sherrod

Attorney at Henke Williams and Boll

2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 3900, 39Th Floor

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

Jesse Coleman

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT, filed by Stryker Corporation. (Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT by Stryker Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

3 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #3

Exhibit 3

3 #4

Exhibit 4

3 #5

Exhibit 5

3 #6

Exhibit 6

3 #7

Exhibit 7

3 #8

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 Response to Motion, filed.(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT filed by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC. (Williams, Jett) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC, filed.(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC, filed.(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Return of Service

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Return of Service)(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stryker Corporation, filed.(Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT, filed by Stryker Corporation. (Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 Response to Motion, filed.(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT filed by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC. (Williams, Jett) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT: Response due by 9/10/2018. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC, filed.(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC, filed.(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Reserve MedTec Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Return of Service)(Williams, Jett) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stryker Corporation, filed.(Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT by Stryker Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2018-43697 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20543346) filed by Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Coleman, Jesse) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.