This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2014 at 02:04:23 (UTC).

West et al v. Precision Directional Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2014 West filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Precision Directional Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard J Bean

Patrick Blake

Casey Book

Bryce Dye

Brandon R Ferguson

Christian P Ferron

Michael G Ferron

Jonathan T Fox

Lance Gilson

Dale Grant

William S Lawrence

Brent McPherson

Joseph Neely

Terry R Parker

Rodney Samuel

Nicholas R Simonds

Kristian Slatten

Luis A. Suarez, Jr.

Bruce West

James Winstead

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew Dunlap

Attorney at Fibich Hampton et al

1150 Bissonnet St

Houston, TX 77005

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Fibich, Hampton, LeeBron, Briggs & Josephson, LLP

1150 Bissonnet St.

Houston, TX 77005

Other Attorneys

Kimberly Frances Cheeseman

Attorney at Fulbright and Jaworski LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77004

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Fulbright Jaworski LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Carter Walker Dugan

Attorney at Fulbright And Jaworski LLP

1301 Mckinney, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Rea Katrina Ferandez

Attorney at Fulbright and Jaworski LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010-9936

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-12878343) filed by Bruce West, Casey Book.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/20/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of Bruce West, filed. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Bruce West, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

5 #1

Exhibit A-Consent form

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Casey Book, Terry R Parker, Bruce West, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

7 #1

Exhibit A-Consent form

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

#33

(#33) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Settlement by Bruce West, filed. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

#35

(#35) ORDER. Closing Papers due by 12/15/2014. Should the parties fail to timely file such documents with this Court, parties are ORDERED to appear before this Court on December 17, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. to explain why they have failed to comply with this Order (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ssyler, 2) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

36 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Form

#36

(#36) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

37 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Form

#37

(#37) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#38

(#38) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Bruce West, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Resetting by agreement. Parties notified. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Resetting by agreement. Parties notified. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Bruce West, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER. Closing Papers due by 12/15/2014. Should the parties fail to timely file such documents with this Court, parties are ORDERED to appear before this Court on December 17, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. to explain why they have failed to comply with this Order (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ssyler, 2) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE of Settlement by Bruce West, filed. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Filing Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER granting DEFENDANT PRECISION DIRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL OF RECORD # 27 Motion. Carter Dugan and Kimberly F. Cheeseman of Fulbright & Jaworski are substitued for Deft Precision Directional Services, Inc. and Rea K. Fernandez is withdrawn as attorney of record.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ssyler, 2) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Drilling Corporation served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Directional Services, Inc. served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Casey Book, Terry R Parker, Bruce West, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Bruce West, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Bruce West, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of Bruce West, filed. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Summons Issued as to Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: In person, filed.(wbostic, 4) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/20/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-12878343) filed by Bruce West, Casey Book.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rea Katrina Ferandez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Cheeseman