This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:43:25 (UTC).

Wells v. Richardson et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Wells filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Richardson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr, John W. deGravelles and Shelly D. Dick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01037

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judges

John W. deGravelles

Shelly D. Dick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelvin Wells

Baton Rouge, LA 70820

Defendants

Unknown Richardson

Sid Gautreaux, III

East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Marie Lamothe

Attorney at Erlingson Banks, PLC

301 Main Sreet, Suite 2110

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Mary G. Erlingson

Attorney at Erlingson Banks, PLLC

301 Main Street, Suite 2110

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Unknown Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lamothe, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department, Sid Gautreaux, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lamothe, Alexandra) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

4 #2

Proposed Pleading; Order

9 #3

Proposed Pleading; Order

9 #1

Attachment Exhibit A

9 #2

Attachment Exhibit B

#8

(#8) ORDER denying as unnecessary #6 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Wells. (KAH) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand with Exhibits by Kelvin Wells. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(KAH) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department, Sid Gautreaux, III, Unknown Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lamothe, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

2 #3

Exhibit A

2 #4

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) MOTION to Substitute Defendants' Notice of Removal Doc.1 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Lamothe, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

2 #2

Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Unknown Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lamothe, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying as unnecessary #6 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department, Sid Gautreaux, III, Unknown Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lamothe, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 MOTION to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Wells. (KAH) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand with Exhibits by Kelvin Wells. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(KAH) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department, Sid Gautreaux, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lamothe, Alexandra) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute Defendants' Notice of Removal Doc.1 filed by Unknown Richardson, Sid Gautreaux, III, East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department. The Clerk of Court shall substitute R. Doc. 2-2 and attachments for the current Notice of Removal and attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/4/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Defendants' Notice of Removal Doc.1. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Substitute Defendants' Notice of Removal Doc.1 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Lamothe, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-673642. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1866215), filed by Sid Gautreaux, III, East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Department, Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Attachment)(Lamothe, Alexandra) Modified on 12/6/2018 to replace documents as per rec doc 3 (KAH). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.