This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2018 at 07:50:08 (UTC).

Wells v. Client Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Wells filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Client Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00524

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Wells

Defendant

Client Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor R Wandres

Attorney at Paramount Law

4835 S Peoria Ave Ste 1

Tulsa, OK 74105

Defendant Attorney

Bobby Glynn Irby

Attorney at Morgan & Assoc PC

2601 Nw Expressway, Ste 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Client Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney Bobby Glynn Irby added to party Client Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Irby, Bobby) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Client Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Patrick Wells (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/10/2018) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Client Services, Inc. (Irby, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrick Wells (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

4 #2

Exhibit 2 Green Card

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Client Services, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1969423) by Patrick Wells (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit 1 Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Client Services, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Client Services, Inc. (Irby, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Client Services, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/10/2018) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Client Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney Bobby Glynn Irby added to party Client Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Irby, Bobby) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Client Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Patrick Wells (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Client Services, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Client Services, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1969423) by Patrick Wells (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrick Wells (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.