This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 07:06:10 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc v. Ogden et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Ogden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-01394

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc

Defendants

Lewis Dorrington

Stanley Ogden

Mary Mark

Eleanor O'Keefe

John Haskell, Jr

Marcia Ogden

ABD Insurance and Financial Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Patrick Holt

James G Zissler

Defendant Attorneys

Justo Gonzalez

Jaime Cuevas, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER granting parties' 25 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.

#20

(#20) ORDER granting parties' 19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure Deadline; Initial Disclosure Deadline is EXTENDED to 11/3/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting parties' 25 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting parties' 19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure Deadline; Initial Disclosure Deadline is EXTENDED to 11/3/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABD Insurance & Financial Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Patrick Holt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James G Zissler