This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2018 at 07:57:57 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank v. Muhammad

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Wells Fargo Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Muhammad. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06548

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank

Defendant

Ronald Muhammad

Chicgao, IL 60653

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam A Price

Attorney at Codilis & Associates, P.C.

15W030 N. Frontage Road

Burr Ridge, IL 60527

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Certificate of Service

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Adam A Price for presentment of motion to bar #12 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Muhammad for presentment of motion for reconsideration #15 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#15

(#15) MOTION by Defendant Ronald Muhammad for reconsideration. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#14

(#14) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 11/15/18 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (gcy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

12 #1

Certificate of Service

#12

(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank to bar additional filings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

10 #14

Certificate of Service

10 #13

Exhibit M

10 #12

Exhibit L

10 #11

Exhibit K

10 #10

Exhibit J

10 #9

Exhibit I

10 #8

Exhibit H

10 #5

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Group C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Motion by Adam A Price for presentment of motion to bar #12 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Muhammad for presentment of motion for reconsideration #15 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION by Defendant Ronald Muhammad for reconsideration. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 11/15/18 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (gcy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 11/15/2018. Plaintiff's motion #10 to remand the Third Notice of Removal is granted. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, from where it originated, forthwith. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank to bar additional filings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Motion by Adam A Price for presentment of motion to remand, #10 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/15/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Group C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank by Adam A Price (Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Muhammad as to Wells Fargo Bank on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Correction regarding Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP) #5 . (kp, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank (yt) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 9/27/2018 (kp, ). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Ronald Muhammad. (kp, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from The Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois County Department, Chancery Division, case number (12 CH 021767) filed by Ronald Muhammad. (kp, ) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.